Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:09:55 (UTC).

DANIEL MALTZMAN VS GERSON MEJIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2016 DANIEL MALTZMAN filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against GERSON MEJIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2026

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MALTZMAN DANIEL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

MEJIA GERSON

MEJIA MOISES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GOODKIN & LYNCH LLP .

Defendant Attorney

ELIOT SARA ESQ

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

11/28/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

12/14/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

1/24/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS GERSON MEJIA AND MOISES MEJIA'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/17/2017: DEFENDANTS GERSON MEJIA AND MOISES MEJIA'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/20/2017: Minute Order

Proof of Service

8/21/2017: Proof of Service

PLAINTIFF DANIEL MALTZMAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GERSON MEJIA AND MOISES MEJIA'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; ETC

8/21/2017: PLAINTIFF DANIEL MALTZMAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GERSON MEJIA AND MOISES MEJIA'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; ETC

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

9/14/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

PLAINTIFF DANIEL MALTZMAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GERSON MEMA AND MOISES MEJIA'S MOTION TO VACATE; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. SHAKOURI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF

10/10/2017: PLAINTIFF DANIEL MALTZMAN'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GERSON MEMA AND MOISES MEJIA'S MOTION TO VACATE; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL A. SHAKOURI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Proof of Service

10/10/2017: Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE

10/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order

10/23/2017: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE

10/23/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

Unknown

11/28/2017: Unknown

DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE NOTICE 0 OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE CMC AND HEARING ON 4TTORNEY FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SARA ELIOT

12/4/2017: DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE NOTICE 0 OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE CMC AND HEARING ON 4TTORNEY FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SARA ELIOT

Minute Order

12/4/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AGAINST SARA ELIOT, ESQ., DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION, CONTINUED CMC, AND OSC RE: JUDGMENT

12/4/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AGAINST SARA ELIOT, ESQ., DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION, CONTINUED CMC, AND OSC RE: JUDGMENT

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS? FEES AND COSTS AGAINST SARA ELIOT, ESQ.

12/4/2017: ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS? FEES AND COSTS AGAINST SARA ELIOT, ESQ.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • Statement of the Case (AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Daniel Maltzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Judgment (BY COURT RE: (1) ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AGAINST SARA ELIOT, ESQ.; AND (2) PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANTS-ANSWER BEING STRICKEN, AND DEFAULT ENTERED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 44; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Denied without prejudice) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Writ-Other Issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • ORDER STRIKING ANSWERS AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Order; Filed by Daniel Maltzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Writ-Other Issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND OSC RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Daniel Maltzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Daniel Maltzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less