This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 14:22:58 (UTC).

DANIEL FLORES ET AL VS EAST COAST FOODS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 DANIEL FLORES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against EAST COAST FOODS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1457

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DUARTE JOSE

FLORES DANIEL

SPEARS DOMINIQUE

COOK ETTIEONNE

FABER MAURICE

MCKENZIE TOIVA

MONCAYO ARTHUR

Defendants and Respondents

FREEWAY FOODS INC.

SHORELINE FOODS INC.

EAST COAST FOODS INC.

AMUSEMENT FOODS INC.

ROECOE'S HOUSE OF CHICKEN N' WAFFLES

WAFFLE PLAZA PROPERTIES

HERNANDEZ LISA

TERRONES ADRIANA

ROSCOE'S HOUSE OF CHICKEN N' WAFFLES

JALILIAN LIZBETH

ROSCOE'S INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIES LLC

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

EAST COAST FOODS INC. DBA ROSCOE'S HOUSE OF CHICKEN N' WAFFLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CUMMINGS & FRANCK P.C.

CUMMINGS SCOTT

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MERTENS GLEN H. ESQ.

MERTENS GLEN H.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

1/11/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

1/11/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice

2/22/2019: Notice

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/9/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE

3/18/2016: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE

FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

4/21/2016: FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

Unknown

5/4/2016: Unknown

Unknown

5/4/2016: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AM. SUM.

5/10/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AM. SUM.

PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AM. SUM.

5/10/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AM. SUM.

PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AM. SUM.

5/10/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AM. SUM.

PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AM. SUM.

5/10/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AM. SUM.

PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AM. SUM.

5/10/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AM. SUM.

Minute Order

5/23/2016: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AM. SUM.

5/26/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AM. SUM.

Minute Order

9/23/2016: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/10/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE OCTOBER 23, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE

10/20/2017: STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE OCTOBER 23, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Notice (of Results from Case Management Conference with POS); Filed by Daniel Flores (Plaintiff); Dominique Spears [Dismissed on 10/01/2017] (Plaintiff); Jose Duarte (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Ettieonne Cook (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by East Coast Foods, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Ettieonne Cook (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-23 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (Conference-Bankruptcy Status; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Daniel Flores (Plaintiff); Dominique Spears [Dismissed on 10/01/2017] (Plaintiff); Jose Duarte (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) RETALIATION FOR PARTICIPATING IN/TESTIFYING IN A FEHA CASE AND/OR FOR OPPOSING PRACTICES FORBIDDEN BY FEHA; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less