This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2019 at 17:39:11 (UTC).

DANIEL FITZGERALD VS BASTIAN GILLMEIER ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/05/2016 DANIEL FITZGERALD filed an Other lawsuit against BASTIAN GILLMEIER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON, EDWARD B. MORETON, JR. and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6222

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FITZGERALD DANIEL

CONTEC DEVELOPMENT

Defendants and Respondents

GABY FERNANDA

DOES 1 TO 20

GILLMEIER BASTIAN

DICKINSON RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

YADEGARI MICHAEL ESQ.

YADEGARI MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings RE ELISOR MOTION)

2/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings RE ELISOR MOTION)

Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL YADEGARI

1/31/2019: Declaration - Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL YADEGARI

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER?CODE CIVIL PROC., ? 585(D))

2/7/2017: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER?CODE CIVIL PROC., ? 585(D))

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

12/1/2016: APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION, POSSESSION OR SALE

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment -

10/11/2018: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment -

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

10/15/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Association of Attorney

11/9/2018: Association of Attorney

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings FOR ORDER APPOINTING THE CLERK OF THE CO...)

11/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ex-Parte Proceedings FOR ORDER APPOINTING THE CLERK OF THE CO...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order ON MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION RE Ex-Parte Proc...)

11/19/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order ON MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION RE Ex-Parte Proc...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order ON MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION RE Ex-Parte Proc...) of 11/19/2018

11/19/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order ON MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION RE Ex-Parte Proc...) of 11/19/2018

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT JUDGMENT DEBTOR

3/27/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT JUDGMENT DEBTOR

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - CIVIL

6/20/2018: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - CIVIL

Minute Order -

6/25/2018: Minute Order -

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF WHISTLE BOLWING LAW; ETC

2/14/2014: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF WHISTLE BOLWING LAW; ETC

SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER -

10/5/2016: SUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER -

COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER -

10/5/2016: COMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/6/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

10/26/2016: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S EX PARTF APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER APPOINTING THE CLERK OF THE COURT OR HIS/HER DESIGNEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings RE ELISOR MOTION)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF MICHAEL YADEGARI); Filed by Daniel Fitzgerald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order ON MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION RE Ex-Parte Proc...) of 11/19/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order ON MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION RE Ex-Parte Proc...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Ex-Parte Proceedings FOR ORDER APPOINTING THE CLERK OF THE CO...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Michael Yadegari (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daniel Fitzgerald (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS (UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF WHISTLE BOLWING LAW; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: BC636222 Hearing Date: October 22, 2021 Dept: 74

\r\n\r\n

BC636222 DANIEL\r\nFITZGERALD VS BASTIAN GILLMEIER

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING: \r\nPlaintiff seeks an assignment order of the judgment debtor spouse Marisol\r\nOrtiz aka Marisol Gillmeier aka Marisol Yotta’s stream of income with\r\nONLYFANS.COM and an order restraining her. \r\nAn assignment order is a court order assigning to the judgment creditor the\r\ndebtor’s right to payments due from a third person. There is no evidence the judgment debtor is\r\nentitled to any payments from his spouse. \r\nThe motion is DENIED. See Sturm\r\nv. Moyer (2019) 32 Cal.App.5th 299, 307; Family Code § 911.

\r\n\r\n'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTEC DEVELOPMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YADEGARI MICHAEL MORDECHAI