This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2019 at 07:24:10 (UTC).

DANIEL A. PEREZ VS. DR. MARK B. KISLINGER, M.D.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2013 DANIEL A PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DR MARK B KISLINGER, M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. MATZ, HALM, HOWARD L., GAIL FEUER and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0933

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. MATZ

HALM, HOWARD L.

GAIL FEUER

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEREZ DANIEL A.

DANIEL A. PEREZ

Defendants

FOOTHILL EYE CARE CENTER

GALLEMORE DR. RON P. M.D.

KISLINGER DR. MARK B. M.D.

RETINA MACULA INSTITUTE

GEORGE S. TAKEDA O.D. INC. DOE 5

GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL DOE 4

GALLEMORE RON P. DR.

KISLINGER MARK B. DR. MD

FOOTHILL EYE CARE CENTER A MED CORP.

PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES OF THE GREATER

KISLINGER DR. MARK B. M.D. (MSJ GTD)

TAKEDA GEORGE S. M.D. (DOE 2)

PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES OF THE GREATER SAN

FOOTHILL EYE CARE CENTER (MSJ GTD)

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

FOOTHILL EYE CARE CENTER MSJ GTD

KISLINGER DR. MARK B. M.D. MSJ GTD

GEORGE S. TAKEDA M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

ALBERTS JEREMY J.

LAW OFFICE OF JEREMY J. ALBERTS

PHILLIPS FRIM THE

THE ALBERTS FIRM

CROSS LISA A.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP

TAYLOR BLESSEY LLP

HINSHAW & CULBERTSON

FRASER WATSON & CROUTCH LLP

THE PHILLIPS FIRM

RAYMOND L. BLESSEY

BLESSEY RAYMOND L.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/4/2015: Minute Order

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/22/2013: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF DANIEL A. PEREZ?S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

8/22/2014: ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF DANIEL A. PEREZ?S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

7/30/2015: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/16/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANTS MARK B. K1SLINGER, M.D. AND FOOTHILL EYE CARE CENTER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL A. PEREZ; DECLARAT

6/19/2014: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY DEFENDANTS MARK B. K1SLINGER, M.D. AND FOOTHILL EYE CARE CENTER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL A. PEREZ; DECLARAT

NOTICE OF REVIVAL OF CORPORATE STATUS OF DEFENDANT, FOOTHILL EYE CARE CENTER; BRIEF RE EFFECT OF REVIVAL OF CORPORATE STATUS

8/15/2014: NOTICE OF REVIVAL OF CORPORATE STATUS OF DEFENDANT, FOOTHILL EYE CARE CENTER; BRIEF RE EFFECT OF REVIVAL OF CORPORATE STATUS

JUDGMENT DISMISSING ACTION

2/8/2018: JUDGMENT DISMISSING ACTION

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

7/31/2014: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)- AMENDED

7/9/2018: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)- AMENDED

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/17/2015: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OT REASONABSE DILIGENCE

6/19/2015: DECLARATION OT REASONABSE DILIGENCE

ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MARK B. KISLINGER, M.D. AND FOOTHILL EYE CARE CENTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT ?B?

6/23/2014: ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS MARK B. KISLINGER, M.D. AND FOOTHILL EYE CARE CENTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT ?B?

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

6/26/2014: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/19/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

7/29/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

2/11/2015: NOTICE OF RULING

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

12/19/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by MARK B. KISLINGER M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by FOOTHILL EYE CARE CENTER, A MED CORP. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt (AMENDED ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Ntc to Prty re fee Clk's Transcpt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Ntc to Atty re Notice of Appeal (Amended ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED JURISDICTION)- AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Notice (CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL NOA 2/8/18 AND 2/8/18 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
601 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2013
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by DANIEL A. PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by DANIEL A. PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 93; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • Complaint; Filed by DANIEL A. PEREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.