This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2016 at 22:17:43 (UTC).

DANIAH ALSOHAIBIBI VS. KORZON DESIGN GROUP ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2013 DANIAH ALSOHAIBIBI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KORZON DESIGN GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NORMAN P. TARLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9684

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NORMAN P. TARLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALSOHAIBIBI DANIAH

Defendants

KORZON DESIGN GROUP

KORZON NATALIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HASHEMI MAJID

Defendant Attorney

WENDI A. SORENSEN

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/5/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES AND ORDER THEREON

5/27/2014: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES AND ORDER THEREON

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketNotice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketAnswer Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less