This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 13:01:31 (UTC).

DAISY CALLEJA VS JOSE CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 03/05/2015 DAISY CALLEJA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE CHAVEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID SOTELO, ERNEST M. HIROSHIGE, GEORGINA T. RIZK and PETER J. MIRICH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4549

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID SOTELO

ERNEST M. HIROSHIGE

GEORGINA T. RIZK

PETER J. MIRICH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CALLEJA DAISY

Defendants and Respondents

CHAVEZ JOSE

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

DAN KERR TRUCKING INC. (DOE 1)

WONG JEFFREY (DOE 1)

ACTIVE LOGISTICS SOLUTIONS INC. (DOE 2)

COUGAR SERVICE INC. (DOE 2)

WONG JEFFREY DOE 1

DAN KERR TRUCKING INC. DOE 1

COUGAR SERVICE INC. DOE 2

ACTIVE LOGISTICS SOLUTIONS INC. DOE 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RAYMOND GHERMEZIAN A PROF. LAW CORP.

SIMON ROBERT TERRENCE ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

REISINGER ROBERT LEE ESQ.

HILL EDYE ANN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS RETAINED EXPERTS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL SAID EXPERTS' DEPOSITIONS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING OF

4/10/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCLUDE DEFENDANTS RETAINED EXPERTS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL SAID EXPERTS' DEPOSITIONS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING OF

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. TO EXCLUDE ANY ARGUMENT PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MITIGATE HER DAMAGES BY NOT TREATING THROUGH HEALTH INSURANCE AND/OR MEDICARE/MEDICAL/MEDICAID

5/22/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. TO EXCLUDE ANY ARGUMENT PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MITIGATE HER DAMAGES BY NOT TREATING THROUGH HEALTH INSURANCE AND/OR MEDICARE/MEDICAL/MEDICAID

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DUPLICATIVE EXPERTS ROBERT SNOOK AND JOHN SMITH; DECLARATION OF EDYE A. HILL

5/30/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE DUPLICATIVE EXPERTS ROBERT SNOOK AND JOHN SMITH; DECLARATION OF EDYE A. HILL

DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION INLIMINE NO.2

5/31/2018: DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION INLIMINE NO.2

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF AGNES GROGAN AT TIME OF TRIAL

6/4/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PLAY THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF AGNES GROGAN AT TIME OF TRIAL

EX PARTE APPLICAITON TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS EXPERT ANDREW MORRIS D.C. TO COMPLETE HIS DEPOSITION AND ANSWER QUESTIONS REOPEN EXPERT WITNESS DISCOVERY;AND ETC.

6/7/2018: EX PARTE APPLICAITON TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS EXPERT ANDREW MORRIS D.C. TO COMPLETE HIS DEPOSITION AND ANSWER QUESTIONS REOPEN EXPERT WITNESS DISCOVERY;AND ETC.

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE THAT PLAINTIFF WAS REFERRED TO DOCTORS BY AN ATTORNEY OR THAT PLAINTIFF TREATED ON LIEN

6/12/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE THAT PLAINTIFF WAS REFERRED TO DOCTORS BY AN ATTORNEY OR THAT PLAINTIFF TREATED ON LIEN

Minute Order

9/10/2018: Minute Order

Reply

11/9/2018: Reply

Minute Order

11/15/2018: Minute Order

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/29/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORIES

10/15/2015: PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FORM INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PACIFIC BELL TO COMPLY WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS, ETC

10/5/2016: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PACIFIC BELL TO COMPLY WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS, ETC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTON OF DOCUMENTS. SET TWO; ETC.

10/14/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR IDENTIFICATION AND PRODUCTON OF DOCUMENTS. SET TWO; ETC.

Minute Order

1/4/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING CONTINUING TRIAL, FSC AND ALL DATES INCLUDING DISCOVERY

3/22/2017: NOTICE OF RULING CONTINUING TRIAL, FSC AND ALL DATES INCLUDING DISCOVERY

Minute Order

12/14/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND ALL DATES

12/18/2017: NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND ALL DATES

141 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S29, Peter J. Mirich, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference (After Jury Trial and Passing of Defendant Jose Chavez) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S29, Peter J. Mirich, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (of Defendants Dan Kerr Trucking, Inc. (Doe 1) and Active Logistics Solutions, Inc,. (Doe 2) for Failure of Plaintiff to Enter Default / Default Judgment, and of Defts .Jeffrey Wong (Doe 1) & Cougar Service, Inc. (Does 2) for Failure to Serve/Prosecute) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Opening of an Estate as to named Defendant Jose Chavez) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Opening of An Estate as to Named Defe...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Minute Order ((Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
321 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daisy Calleja (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Daisy Calleja (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daisy Calleja (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Daisy Calleja (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Daisy Calleja (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC574549    Hearing Date: March 19, 2020    Dept: 29

Calleja v. Chavez   -  BC574549

Hearing on the Motion to Extend Discovery Cut off Date is continued to 5/6/2020 at 1:30 pm.

Based on current conditions, including, but not limited to, the spread of COVID-19, the need for social distancing, and a state of emergency having been declared by Governor Newsom, the court finds good cause to continue the hearing.

The Court is ordered to give notice.