This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 09:52:30 (UTC).

DAE WON HONG VS. EVELYN'S FAMILY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/12/2016 DAE WON HONG filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against EVELYN'S FAMILY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAURICE A. LEITER and KELVIN D. FILER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8641

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAURICE A. LEITER

KELVIN D. FILER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HONG DAE WON

Defendants

DOES 1-10

KIM OK JOO

EVELYN'S FAMILY INC.

KIM KYU H.

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DELAPLANE CHRISTOPHER E.

RENTTO DAVID ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

6/7/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Certificate of Mailing for

6/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Substitution of Attorney

4/12/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/9/2019: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Application and Order for Appearance and Examination]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by DAE WON HONG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by CHRISTOPHER E. DELAPLANE (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department A; Hearing on Motion to Vacate ((Denied)) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • at 09:00 am in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Motion to Vacate (JUDGMENT;) - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-06-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by DAE WON HONG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT ); Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Appl for Writ of Possession (C&D); Filed by Plaintiff/Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by DAE WON HONG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by DAE WON HONG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: ALL TENANTS AND SUBTENANTS IN POSSESSION AND ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by DAE WON HONG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less