This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 00:45:08 (UTC).

CYNTHIA WILLIAMS VS DEL AMO HOSPITAL ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/12/2014 CYNTHIA WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DEL AMO HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN VAN SICKLEN, STUART M. RICE and GAIL FEUER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8402

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEVEN VAN SICKLEN

STUART M. RICE

GAIL FEUER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WILLIAMS CYNTHIA

Defendants and Respondents

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

DEL AMO HOSPITAL

DOES 1 - 50

DOES 2-50

FREINHAR JACK M.D.

MEDCOAST AMBULANCE SERVICE

MEDCOAST MEDSERVICES INC.

ONE UNKNOWN EMPLOYEE OF THE COUNTY OF LOS

TOBIAS KAREN S. R.N.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BROWN GARY S. ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF GARY BROWN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

AVERBUCK CLAYTON C.

BUCHHOLZ SCOTT D. ESQ.

DUMMIT BUCHHOLZ & TRAPP

HERZFELD & RUBIN

ZUK MICHAEL A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

6/12/2014: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT (1) STATUTORY VIOLATIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS; ETC

6/12/2014: COMPLAINT (1) STATUTORY VIOLATIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS; ETC

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE ON MEDCOAST MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. D.B.A MEDCOAST AMBULANCE SERVICE

6/27/2014: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE ON MEDCOAST MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. D.B.A MEDCOAST AMBULANCE SERVICE

DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL'S NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/22/2014: DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL'S NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF SERVICE

7/22/2014: DECLARATION OF SERVICE

DECLARATION OF JANELLE R. THORNTON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

7/22/2014: DECLARATION OF JANELLE R. THORNTON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF JANELLE R. THORNTON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

7/22/2014: DECLARATION OF JANELLE R. THORNTON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/22/2014: DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/22/2014: DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

7/22/2014: DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL'S NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

7/22/2014: DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL'S NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

7/22/2014: DEFENDANT DEL AMO HOSPITAL'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/7/2014: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

DEFENDANT JACK FREINHAR, M.D?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/12/2014: DEFENDANT JACK FREINHAR, M.D?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DEFENDANT JACK FREINHAR, M.D.?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL H. ABRAHAMIAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/12/2014: DEFENDANT JACK FREINHAR, M.D.?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL H. ABRAHAMIAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/20/2014: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/20/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Unknown

9/18/2014: Unknown

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2016
  • Opposition (TO MTN TO AMEND COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Notice of Continuance (OF CMC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Answer to Third Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Answer to Third Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Declaration (OF SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other (REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Answer to Third Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2014
  • Points and Authorities ( MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PTF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Points and Authorities ( MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PTF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Notice ( OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PTF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Demurrer ( TO PTF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Motion to Strike ( PORTIONS OF PTF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Declaration ( OF JANELL R. THORNTON IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PTF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Notice (OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE ON MEDCOAST MEDICAL SERVICES, INC., D.B.B MEDCOAST AMBULANCE SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDCOAST AMBULANCE SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where MedCoast Medservice Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEL AMO HOSPITAL, INC., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant