This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2016 at 18:34:27 (UTC).

CULVER CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT VS. SITE LEASE ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 07/25/2013 CULVER CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SITE LEASE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LISA HART COLE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1078

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LISA HART COLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CULVER CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

BARNHART

CONSTRUCTION SERVICES AGREEMENT

SITE LEASE

SUBLEASE AGREEMENT

BALFOUR BEATTY CONSTRUCTION

BARNHART-BALFOUR BEATTY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCLOUGHLIN STEPHEN M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2014
  • Declaration (OF STEPHEN M. MCLOUGHLIN, ESQ. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Memo points & authorities (IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEJ JUDGMT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Default Judgment Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Application - misc (FOR ENTRY OF DEF JUDGMT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Miscellaneous-Other (PROOF OF POSTING AMENDED SUMMONS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • Declaration (OF MICHAEL REYNOLDS IN SUPPORT OF PLNTFF'S APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEF & DEF JUDGMT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Proof of Publication Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Default Entered Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Request for Entry of Default Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • Order Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • Order for Publication (ORDER FOR PUBLICATION, POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS (ORDER SIGNED BY JUDGE LISA HART COLE) ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • ExParte Application (for publication, posting and mailing summons ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CULVER CITY UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where BARNHART-BALFOUR BEATTY INC. DBA BALFOUR is a litigant

Latest cases where Barnhart is a litigant

Latest cases where BALFOUR BEATTY CONSTRUCTION LLC is a litigant