This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 03:59:11 (UTC).

CRYSTAL SCOTT VS AMERICAN AIRLINES INC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 CRYSTAL SCOTT filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AMERICAN AIRLINES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4347

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SCOTT CRYSTAL

Defendants and Respondents

AMERICAN AIRLINES INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN J. DELSHAD PC.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

12/16/2015: SUMMONS

COMPMLAINT I. FAILURE TO HIRE IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

12/16/2015: COMPMLAINT I. FAILURE TO HIRE IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/29/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

4/26/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/7/2016: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/1/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE [LOCAL RULE 3.22]

4/21/2016: NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE [LOCAL RULE 3.22]

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/23/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.?S NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

1/26/2016: DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.?S NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Notice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE [LOCAL RULE 3.22]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. S NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Crystal Scott (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • COMPMLAINT I. FAILURE TO HIRE IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less