This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2016 03:23:31

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 09/12/2011 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by Crystal Reed against Peter John Nottoli in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXX1251
  • Filing Date 09/12/2011
  • Case Status Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Petitioner Reed Crystal
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Respondent Nottoli Peter John
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2012
  • Notice-Entry-Judgment
  • 05/31/2012
  • Judgment
  • 02/03/2012
  • Judgment-Package Received-2336
  • 01/27/2012
  • Declaration-Property Filed by Petitioner
  • 01/27/2012
  • Request-Enter Default Filed by Petitioner
  • 01/27/2012
  • Declaration-Serv Pre Dec Dis Inc Filed by Petitioner
  • 01/27/2012
  • Declaration-Default Filed by Petitioner
  • 01/27/2012
  • Proof of Service-Mail Filed by Petitioner
  • 09/26/2011
  • Notice-Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Petitioner
  • 09/26/2011
  • Proof of Service-Summons & Com Filed by Petitioner
  • 09/12/2011
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner
  • 09/12/2011
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner
  • 09/12/2011
  • Declaration-Income & Expense Filed by Petitioner

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.