This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 01:42:42 (UTC).

CRUZ, RAYMOND ANTHONY VS CRUZ, VALERY GILES

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 CRUZ, RAYMOND ANTHONY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CRUZ, VALERY GILES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SHORT, MICHELLE and GELFOUND, DAVID B.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3649

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SHORT, MICHELLE

GELFOUND, DAVID B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CRUZ RAYMOND ANTHONY

Respondent

CRUZ VALERY GILES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; FCCR Conference - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Submitted for signature F48 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Notice - Change of Address; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Mail - Returned Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2016
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 03-02-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cruz, Raymond ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Declaration (Com Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cruz, Raymond ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cruz, Raymond ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cruz, Raymond ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Declaration (Sep Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Cruz, Raymond ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less