This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2016 at 18:40:12 (UTC).

CRISTY NOEL CELAYA VS FERENC LASZLO CSAKVARY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2009 CRISTY NOEL CELAYA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FERENC LASZLO CSAKVARY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEINBERG, MARJORIE, MOLONEY, STEPHEN M and CONVEY, MICHAEL J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0604

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEINBERG, MARJORIE

MOLONEY, STEPHEN M

CONVEY, MICHAEL J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CELAYA CRISTY NOEL

Respondent

CSARKVARY FERENC LASZLO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2009
  • Notice-OSC failure to file P/S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • Notice-FCCR Conference (Returned by Post Office )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • Notice-Case Review Re Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • Petition Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • Summons-Family Law Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.