This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 17:06:25 (UTC).

CRISTINA VASQUEZ VS THE PEPBOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CA

Case Summary

On 05/07/2014 CRISTINA VASQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE PEPBOYS MANNY MOE JACK OF CA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4962

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VASQUEZ CRISTINA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

PEPBOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CA. THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRUCE BENJAMIN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LEWIS STEVEN R.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/20/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

ORDER AND STIPUTATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPAERTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

10/13/2015: ORDER AND STIPUTATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPAERTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

9/18/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

1/14/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/17/2014: DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

SUMMONS -

5/7/2014: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5/7/2014: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 97; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE___________________ ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 97; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Cristina Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketORDER AND STIPUTATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (DEPAERTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketStip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Pepboys Manny Moe & Jack of CA., The (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketDEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pepboys Manny Moe & Jack of CA., The (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cristina Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEPBOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CA. THE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS STEVEN R.