This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 14:13:30 (UTC).

CRISTIAN ROMERO VS WESTFIELD AMERICA INC

Case Summary

On 05/05/2016 CRISTIAN ROMERO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WESTFIELD AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9619

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ROMERO CRISTIAN

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY ADMINISTERED

Defendants and Respondents

WESTFIELD AMERICA INC.

DOES 1-50

RIMSHOT DEMOLITION INC.

BAPKO METAL INC. DOE 4 - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

THE RALPH HERNANDEZ COMPANY INC. DOE 3GOOD FAITH

RALPH HERNANDEZ COMPANY INC. THEDOE 3GOOD FAITH

WESTFIELD DEVELOPMENT INC.DOE 2SUMJ.

SANTA ANA VENTURE A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

AESTHETIC MAINTENANCE CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

YUHL CARR LLP

LAW OFFICE OF RAMIN SOOFER

CARR JAMES P. ESQ.

BARNETT TYLER JAMES

Defendant Attorneys

LOUREIRO KARL R. ESQ.

CLEELAND BRUCE

LARIN MICHAEL J. ESQ.

BEATTY SEAN D. ESQ.

MACKEY ROBERT T. ESQ.

VEATCH CARLSON LLP

HAYES PHILLIP MICHAEL

CARRON PAUL A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

2/9/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

DEFENDANT WESTFIELD DEVELOPMENT, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFF-ININTERVENTION'S COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND

4/12/2018: DEFENDANT WESTFIELD DEVELOPMENT, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFF-ININTERVENTION'S COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND

Minute Order

4/17/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT WESTFIELD DEVELOPMENT, INC.'S FURTHER BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/1/2018: DEFENDANT WESTFIELD DEVELOPMENT, INC.'S FURTHER BRIEFING IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Motion for Summary Judgment

3/19/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Request for Judicial Notice

3/19/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice

3/22/2019: Notice

Request for Dismissal

4/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES DUE TO NEGLIGENCE

5/5/2016: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES DUE TO NEGLIGENCE

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

7/14/2016: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDED NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (AS TO TIME ONLY)

10/25/2016: AMENDED NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (AS TO TIME ONLY)

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF QUESTIONS AND ANSWERS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SANTA ANA VENTURE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELL[NG PLAINTIFF CRISTIAN ROMERO'S FURTHER RES

10/25/2016: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF QUESTIONS AND ANSWERS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SANTA ANA VENTURE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELL[NG PLAINTIFF CRISTIAN ROMERO'S FURTHER RES

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

11/29/2016: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS (DEPARTMENT 91, 92, 93, 97)

Minute Order

11/29/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT SANTA ANA VENTURE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF MOTIONS AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQU

12/29/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT SANTA ANA VENTURE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF MOTIONS AND MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND REQU

DEFENDANT SANTA ANA VENTURE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; ETC

1/31/2017: DEFENDANT SANTA ANA VENTURE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; ETC

DEFENDANT SANTA ANA VENTURE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; ETC

2/3/2017: DEFENDANT SANTA ANA VENTURE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; ETC

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

2/16/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • Request (Request For Entry of Judgment on Motion For Summary Judgment); Filed by BAPKO Metal, Inc. (Doe 4) - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by BAPKO Metal, Inc. (Doe 4) - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Cypress Insurance Company, administered (Plaintiff in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Notice (Plaintiff's Non-Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by Cristian Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Cristian Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
199 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2016
  • DEFENDANT SANTA ANA VENTURE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Santa Ana Venture, a California limited (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Cristian Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Law Office of Ramin Soofer (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES DUE TO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Cristian Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC619619    Hearing Date: January 17, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

CHRISTIAN ROMERO,

Plaintiff,

v.

WESTFIELD AMERICA, INC., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC619619

Hearing Date: January 17, 2020

[Tentative] order RE:

DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Defendant Rimshot Demolition, Inc. (“Defendant”) seeks to continue the trial date and all related discovery and expert discovery cutoff dates. Defendant was served on March 27, 2019, and it filed an answer on April 9, 2019. Defendant represents that it requires additional time to complete discovery, and Plaintiff does not oppose this motion. Therefore, it is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion for a trial continuance is granted. The current final status conference and trial dates are advanced and vacated. The Court sets the following dates:

Final Status Conference: June 3, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: June 17, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be based on the new trial date. It is highly unlikely that the Court will grant another continuance so the parties should be prepared for trial on that date. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: January 17, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court