This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 09:13:47 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC VS JOBE ROOFING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/28/2015 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOBE ROOFING COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5998

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

JOBE ROOFING CO

JOBE ROOFING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KENNETH J. FREED

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ROBERT W. HIRSH & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY (INSURANCE PREMIUMS)

9/28/2015: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY (INSURANCE PREMIUMS)

SUMMONS

9/28/2015: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/13/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/29/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/29/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JOBE ROOFING COMPANY TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

11/4/2015: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JOBE ROOFING COMPANY TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

1/19/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

1/25/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

2/10/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/11/2016: NOTICE OF RULING ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

2/17/2016: NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

2/17/2016: NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Notice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY (INSURANCE PREMIUMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOBE ROOFING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant