This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2016 at 22:37:50 (UTC).

CRAIG BROWN VS TERESA OUTZEN, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 11/02/2012 CRAIG BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TERESA OUTZEN, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD L. HALM, RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and YVONNE T. SANCHEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2243

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD L. HALM

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

YVONNE T. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN CRAIG

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CAMPOS BELEN M.

OUTZEN TERESA

PRG INVESTMENTS INC. A CORP. -DOE 1

CMC REALTY

GLINIAK PETER -DOE 2

SPECIALTY ROOFING

ROSEMONT MORTGAGE

Cross Plaintiffs

GLINIAK PETER

PRG INVESTMENTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN WILLIAM M LAW OFFICES

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

EARLY MASLACH & O'SHEA

WEISS ROBERT E. INCORPORATED

VEATCH CARLSON LLP

Cross Defendant Attorneys

BORCHARD & CALLAHAN APC

HUBBARD CLINTON L. LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF COURT?S NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE [CCP SEC. 1013(A) & 2015.5]

3/25/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF COURT?S NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE [CCP SEC. 1013(A) & 2015.5]

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/23/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/3/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/3/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/22/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DATES

5/29/2013: NOTICE OF TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DATES

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND CONTRIBUTION

6/6/2013: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND CONTRIBUTION

DEFENDANTS PETER GLINIAK AND PRG INVESTMENTS, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/6/2013: DEFENDANTS PETER GLINIAK AND PRG INVESTMENTS, INC.?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/6/2013: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS PETER GLINIAK AND PRG INVESTMENTS, INC.?S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ROSEMONT MORTGAGE

7/29/2013: DEFENDANTS PETER GLINIAK AND PRG INVESTMENTS, INC.?S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ROSEMONT MORTGAGE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/7/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/7/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/7/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT BROWN & SONS ENTERPRISES, INC. DBA SPECIALTY ROOFING CONTRACTORS TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND CONTRIBUTION

8/27/2013: ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT BROWN & SONS ENTERPRISES, INC. DBA SPECIALTY ROOFING CONTRACTORS TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND CONTRIBUTION

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND CONTRIBUTION

9/5/2013: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT AND CONTRIBUTION

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/29/2013: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

11/8/2013: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

12/3/2013: Minute Order

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2015
  • Partial Dismissal W/out Prejudice Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • Partial Dismissal With Prejudice (re deft Teresa Outzen ONLY ) Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Partial Dismissal With Prejudice (COMPLAINT AS TO PETER GLINIAK AND PRG INVESTMENTS, INC. ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Partial Dismissal With Prejudice (re Peter Gliniak & PRG Investments Inc. ****ONLY ) Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • Notice (OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • Statement of Facts (SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (To Continue Trial, FSC [And Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97) FSC 07-23-15 TRL 08-04-15) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • Proof of Service (BY MAIL OF SIGNED ORDER & STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC & RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2013
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Summons Filed Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO BELEN M. CAMPOS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (AS TO TERESA OUTZEN DBA CMC REALTY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less