This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2015 at 00:47:24 (UTC).

COVE BUILDERS, INC VS FOREFRONT BUILDERS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/05/2008 COVE BUILDERS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FOREFRONT BUILDERS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MINK, MICHAEL S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8545

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MINK, MICHAEL S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COVE BUILDERS INC

Defendants

AMERICANA HOMES LLC

AMERICANA HOUSING LP

BANK OF AMERICA

FOREFRONT BUILDERS CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANAK & HANNA P.C. LAW OFFICES OF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2009
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice as to the entire action of all parties and all causes of action; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • DocketProof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. (sub svc and mailing on 3-5-09; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • DocketProof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. (personal svc on 2-24-09; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • DocketProof of Svc of Summons & Co./Ptn. (sub svc and mailing on 2-24-09; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2008
  • DocketNotice-Pending Action Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • DocketNotice (of commencement of suit; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2008
  • DocketNotice (of order to show cause re failure to comply with trial court delay reduction act ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREFRONT BUILDERS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICANA HOMES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant