This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 18:33:47 (UTC).

COURTLAND PALMER VS SEE GAMES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/13/2013 COURTLAND PALMER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEE GAMES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK A. BORENSTEIN, RICHARD E. RICO and EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2911

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

RICHARD E. RICO

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PALMER COURTLAND

Defendants and Respondents

BIALLAS MARTIN

REDMOND COREY

SEE GAMES LLC

SEE TOURING ATTRACTIONS INC.

SEE TOURING LLC

SEE VIRTUAL WORLDS LLC

SEE VIRTUAL WORLDS MJ LLC

DOES 1 - 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MERIDETH FRANK E. JR. ESQ.

GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GRIVAKES CHRISTOPHER ESQ.

DEBI RAMOS

ROBERT M. ANGEL

PATEL AVISHA ARUN

DEBI RAMOS ATTORNEY AT LAW

ROBERT M. ANGEL ATTORNEY AT LAW

AFFELD GRIVAKES & ZUCKER LLP

AVISHA A. PATEL ATTORNEY AT LAW

A. SINGER & ASSOCIATES LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

11/5/2012: Minute Order

PRO0F OF SERVICE BY MAIL

3/26/2013: PRO0F OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

3/26/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION OF PROMISSORY NOTE, FOR MONEY LENT (COMMON COUNT), AND FRAUD

6/10/2013: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION OF PROMISSORY NOTE, FOR MONEY LENT (COMMON COUNT), AND FRAUD

Minute Order

6/21/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/11/2013: Minute Order

AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/17/2013: AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

COREY REDMOND'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/29/2013: COREY REDMOND'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TOUNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS SEE GAMES, LLC, SEE VIRTUAL WORLDS, LLC, SEE VIRTUAL WORLD M.J, LLC, SEE TOURING, LLC, SEE TOURING ATTRACTIONS, LLC,

12/5/2013: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TOUNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS SEE GAMES, LLC, SEE VIRTUAL WORLDS, LLC, SEE VIRTUAL WORLD M.J, LLC, SEE TOURING, LLC, SEE TOURING ATTRACTIONS, LLC,

Minute Order

1/29/2014: Minute Order

JUDGMENT

10/8/2014: JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF MARTIN BIALLAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

10/24/2016: DECLARATION OF MARTIN BIALLAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF COURTLAND PALMER AND EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

12/28/2016: DECLARATION OF COURTLAND PALMER AND EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order

2/16/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT ANGEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MARTIN BIALLAS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FOLLOWING TRIAL

5/8/2017: DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT ANGEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MARTIN BIALLAS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FOLLOWING TRIAL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF COURTLAND PALMER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE COURTLAND TRUST'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS; ETC

5/19/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF COURTLAND PALMER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE COURTLAND TRUST'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS; ETC

DECLARATION OF FRANK E. MERIDETH, JR. OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

5/19/2017: DECLARATION OF FRANK E. MERIDETH, JR. OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES

Minute Order

8/4/2017: Minute Order

174 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • Declaration (OF ATTY ANNE SINGER IN OPPOSITION TO PLT/JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S DEMAND FOR SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Writ of Execution filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other (DEMAND FOR SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment (REJECTED: JUDGMENT AMT INCORRECT RETURNED TO ATTY SVC ); Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Writ-Other Issued (REJECTED: 8/22/17 WRIT OUTSTANDING RETURNED TO ATTY SVC ); Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Exparte proceeding - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATIONN FOR ORDER TO COMPEL CORRECTION OF WRIT OF EXECU EXECUTION AND INSTRUCTIONS TO THE LEVYING OFFICER PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 684.130(A) OR TO QUASH WRIT OF EXECUTION AND INSTRUCTIONS); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Order to Appear for Examination; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
129 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Demurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Affidavit - misc; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

| ORIGINAL @ ® o

1 || GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

FRANK E. MERIDETH (SBN 046266) -~ < 2 {| VICTORIA J. IANNI (SBN 266583) LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT 1840 Century Park East, Suite 1900 3 || Los Angeles, California 90067 | MAR 13 200 | Telephone: (310) 586-7700 - JOHN A. CLABKE, CLERK }b 4 ||Facsimile: (310) 586-7800 /1/7 U Email: MeridethF(@gtlaw.com BY MARY FYORES, DEP S S lanniV@gtlaw.com ' '\% 6 || Attorneys for Plaintiff COURTLAND PALMER, \,\\ 7 ||as Trustee of the \ q COURTLAND TRUST g 9 "

WQ 10 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA - 11 Q\T FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

ok DN

l: 131 COURTLAND PALMER as Trustee of the | CASE NO. C50289 i > 14 || COURTLANDIRUST, COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION OF Plaintiff PROMISSORY NOTE, FOR MONEY fi. 15 ’ LENT (COMMON COUNT), AND FRAUD 16 VS. 17 SEE Games, LLC, SEE Virtual Worlds, LLC, SEE Virtual Worlds MJ, LLC, SEE 18 Touring, LLC, SEE Touring Attractions, Inc., Martin Biallas, Corey Redmond, and 19 DOES 1 - 50, inclusive, 20 Defendants. 21 22

MM MWL

23 MEmm = - _ S8%a5 RE T DO Mm-S D o 2 SiaESTEL U cELE e

25 - T REE

e i :'::,fi '= L ;413) :”g