This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2015 at 00:53:49 (UTC).

COUNTY OF ORANGE VS FIRST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMER

Case Summary

On 11/04/2011 COUNTY OF ORANGE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIRST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, EMILIE H. ELIAS, MEL RED RECANA and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2901

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

EMILIE H. ELIAS

MEL RED RECANA

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A-1 ASPHALT & SEALCOAT CO.[0564095]

ALLIANCE MECHANICAL CORP [0561228]

ORANGE COUNTY OF

Defendants

ABBA DISTRIBUTORS INC.

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY [0056095]

BEST CONTRACTING SERVICES INC.

DESIGN HARDWARE COMPANY DBA

DOES 1-15

FIRST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMER-

HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION CO INTL INC.

HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INTERNATIO-

MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING INC.

PAINTING UNLIMITED INC

PRISTINE WINDOWS INC.

RND CONTRACTORS INC.

ROES 1-300

STONEY MASONRY INC

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY A SOUTH DAKOTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARNO & CARLTON LLP

FAULKES GARY W. LAW OFFICES OF

HAMERSMITH HAROLD E. ESQ.

KNAPP LAURA D. SENIOR DEPUTY

WOODRUFF SPRADLIN & SMART

Defendant Attorneys

AYVAZI RAFIK ESQ.

KAVCIOGLU ARMENAK ESQ.

KRAMER JEFFREY S.

RAISIN & KAVCIOGLU

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) RECOVERY ON PERFORMANCE BOND; ETC

11/4/2011: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) RECOVERY ON PERFORMANCE BOND; ETC

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INTERNATIONAL, INC.

12/7/2011: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INTERNATIONAL, INC.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/9/2011: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

4/25/2012: Unknown

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/14/2012: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

5/21/2012: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS; REQUEST FOR STAY; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF JACK A. REITMAN IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF KINAN KOTRASII IN SUPPORT

7/6/2012: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS; REQUEST FOR STAY; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF JACK A. REITMAN IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF KINAN KOTRASII IN SUPPORT

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

7/12/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/16/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO CROSSCOMPLAINT; DEMURRER CROSSCOMPLAINT; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

7/31/2012: NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO CROSSCOMPLAINT; DEMURRER CROSSCOMPLAINT; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

CROSS-DEFENDANT MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING, INC.?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INTERNATIONAL, INC.?S CROSSCOMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUT

8/31/2012: CROSS-DEFENDANT MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING, INC.?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INTERNATIONAL, INC.?S CROSSCOMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUT

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

8/31/2012: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF COUNTY OF ORANGE FOR FALSE CLAIMS ACT VIOLATIONS

9/7/2012: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF COUNTY OF ORANGE FOR FALSE CLAIMS ACT VIOLATIONS

Minute Order

10/18/2012: Minute Order

ANSWER OF ALLIANCE MECHANICAL CORPORATION TO THE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INTERNATIONAL, INC.

7/31/2013: ANSWER OF ALLIANCE MECHANICAL CORPORATION TO THE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INTERNATIONAL, INC.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ALLIANCE MECHANICAL CORPORATION

7/31/2013: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ALLIANCE MECHANICAL CORPORATION

STONEY MASONRY, INC.?S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLA1NT OF HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INTERNATIONAL, INC.

8/7/2013: STONEY MASONRY, INC.?S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLA1NT OF HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Unknown

1/22/2016: Unknown

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2015
  • Order (Scheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Association of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Notice of Ruling (AT OCTOBER 21, 2015 POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER FORPARTIES AND ADJUSTERS TO APPEAR IN PERSON ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Report-Status (POST-MEDIATION STATUS REPORT SUBMITTED JOINTLY BY COUNTY OF ORANGE, HORIZONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. AND FIRST NATIONAL INSURANCE ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other (MESSAGE BOARD POSTING ON THE FILE & SERVEXPRESS WEBSITE (FUSC 9/18/15 O/C) ) Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Report-Status Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES RND Contractors, Inc. ) Filed by Associated Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Ruling (SECOND AMENDED AS TO RULINGS AT JULY 1, 2015 HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Notice of Ruling (AMENDED AT JULY 1, 2015 HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Notice of Ruling (NOTICE OF RULINGS AT JULY 1, 2015 HEARING ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2012
  • Stipulation and Order (setting aside default of 1st National ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • Defendant's Demurrer (of demurrer and demurrer ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • Default Entered (AS FIRST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, A WASHINGTON CORP * *set aside 2/15/12) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • Defendant's Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • Declaration (RE SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.