This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 04:26:37 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. VICTORIA CAMACHO, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2011 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against VICTORIA CAMACHO, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN J. WEBSTER, JR., LAW & MOTION, ROSE HOM and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5642

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALLEN J. WEBSTER, JR.

LAW & MOTION

ROSE HOM

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CAMACHO VICTORIA

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

KIM BOK J.

KIM SONG H.

CAMACHO RECYCLING CENTER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KIM BOK J.

KIM SONG H.

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Not Classified By Court

FREIBERG JR. THOMAS A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL'S OFFICE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FLORES ALDO A. LAW OFFICES OF

KENNETH A. FREEDMAN LAW OFFICES OF

PIERCE LAW FIRM APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketPaper file destroyed; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department A, Lynn D. Olson, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (-Receipt of Request for Dismissalw/the Court Retaining JurisdictionPur. to Section 664.6 of the CCP) - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal (OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT & DOES 1-10 W/PREJUDICE; & DEFENDANTS/CROSS- COMPLAINANTS REQUEST FOR RETENTION OF JURISDICTION ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal (OF COMPLAINT & DOES 1-10 W/PREJU- DICE; & PLAINTIFF COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' REQUEST FOR RETENTION OF JURISDICTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department A, Lynn D. Olson, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (re Status of Settlement) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Docketat 09:30 am in Department A, Law & Motion, Presiding; Motion for Summary Judgment - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department A, Lynn D. Olson, Presiding; Conference-Post Mediation Status (TD: 9/10/12FSC: 8/30/12MCD: 7/27/127/27/12) - Trial Date Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department E, Allen J. Webster, Jr., Presiding; Exparte proceeding (Exparte Application is granted.) - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • DocketDeclaration (OF SENIOR PLANNER ALICE WONG IN SUPPORT OF PLNTFF'S MTN FOR SJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2011
  • DocketDeclaration (OF ZONING ENFORCEMENT OFFICER EDWARD ROJAS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PELIMINARY INJUNCTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • DocketDeclaration (OF SUPERVISING TAX AND FIELD INSPECTOR CRISTINA HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketCross-Compl fld - Summons Issued (SONG H. KIM, BOK J. KIM VS. VICTORIA CAMACHO, ind. and dba CAMACHO RECYCLING CENTER, and ROES 1 through 10, Inclusive ); Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2011
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF is a litigant