This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 06:07:18 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. ROBERT ALLEN RICHARDS, JR.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2015 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against ROBERT ALLEN RICHARDS, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA and VILLEGAS, ANGELA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6122

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA

VILLEGAS, ANGELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

RICHARDS ROBERT ALLEN

Respondent

RICHARDS ROBERT ALLEN JR

Other and Not Classified By Court

GUARDADO MARIA DEL ROSARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPT.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

10/7/2020: Proof of Service

Order - After Hearing

3/23/2020: Order - After Hearing

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

3/4/2020: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

3/2/2020: DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

Minute Order

3/2/2020: Minute Order

Declaration - Income and Expense

3/2/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

3/2/2020: DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

Request - for Admission

2/5/2020: Request - for Admission

Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

2/5/2020: Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

Responsive Declaration

1/31/2020: Responsive Declaration

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

1/29/2020: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

1/13/2020: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

1/7/2020: Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

DSU - Request for Order (Change) - -Stop Garnishment Order

1/7/2020: DSU - Request for Order (Change) - -Stop Garnishment Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOrder - After Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docketat 8:00 AM in Department 2E, Villegas, Angela, Presiding; DSU - RFO (Modification Hearing) - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Other Parent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b); Filed by Other Parent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest (for Admission ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketProof of Service (Filed and Entered; Filed By Respondent in Pro per; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Set Aside (Filed and Entered; Filed By Respondent in Pro per; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketDSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620 (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketProof of Service (of summons, Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketDSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630 (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketDSU - Judgment Packet Received - FC17430 (Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketComplaint/Summons - Governmental

    Read MoreRead Less