This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2016 at 16:05:07 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. PAULA BERMUDEZ, ET-AL

Case Summary

On 03/06/2013 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PAULA BERMUDEZ, ET-AL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7362

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

Defendants

BERMUDEZ PAULA

JIMENEZ MANUEL ALASKA

KNUTSON ROLF BORCK

SECTRAN SECURITY INCORPORATED

DOES 1 THROUGH 30 INCLUSIVE

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Intervenor

CRAIG EDUARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERSON KIMBALL & JALTOROSIAN

Defendant Attorneys

LAFOLLETTE JOHNSON DEHAAS FESLER & AMES

LAW OFFICE OF MCCARTHY & BEAVERS

KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON & HALUCK LLP

Intervenor Attorney

MOSES VICTOR O. LAW OFFICES OF .

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, PAULA BERMUDEZ, TO COMPLAINT

5/21/2013: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, PAULA BERMUDEZ, TO COMPLAINT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/21/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

5/21/2013: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

SUMMONS CROSS COMPLAINT

6/26/2013: SUMMONS CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT?PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

6/26/2013: CROSS-COMPLAINT?PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

RULING RE: APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

8/7/2013: RULING RE: APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE

NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL OF RELATED CASES INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB VS. SECTRAN SECURITY, ET AL. AND MARIA DEL CARMEN BERNAL VS

8/16/2013: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL OF RELATED CASES INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB VS. SECTRAN SECURITY, ET AL. AND MARIA DEL CARMEN BERNAL VS

Minute Order

8/16/2013: Minute Order

DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION, ROLF BORCK KNUTSON'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY EDUARDO CRAIG

12/9/2013: DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION, ROLF BORCK KNUTSON'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY EDUARDO CRAIG

ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION, PAULA BERMUDEZ, TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ROLF BORCK KNUTSON, CROSS- COMPLAINANT IN INTERVENTION

1/2/2014: ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION, PAULA BERMUDEZ, TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ROLF BORCK KNUTSON, CROSS- COMPLAINANT IN INTERVENTION

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/2/2014: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SECTRAN SECURITY SERVICES, INC. AND MANUEL A. JIMENEZ?S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ROLF BORCK KNUTSON RE REIMBURSEMENT OF WC BENES AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/14/2014: SECTRAN SECURITY SERVICES, INC. AND MANUEL A. JIMENEZ?S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ROLF BORCK KNUTSON RE REIMBURSEMENT OF WC BENES AND COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF 13NAVILABIX.ITY OF COUNSEL

3/20/2014: NOTICE OF 13NAVILABIX.ITY OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

7/28/2014: NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/30/2014: CIVIL DEPOSIT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/10/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

10/27/2014: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/26/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (w/prej, complaint, County of L.A. Complaint as to all defendants ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF IN- INTERVENTION EDUARDO CRAIG AGAINST ALL PARTIES ) Filed by Attorney for Intervenor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • Notice of Ruling ( RE: OSC RE Dismissal ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (PARTIAL DISMISSAL X-COMPLAINT OF ROLF BORCK KNUTSON ONLY ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (WITH PREJUDICE COMPLAINT COUNTY OF LA COMPLAINT ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT ROLF KNUTSON AND AMMOTH TRANSPORTATION, INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Notice (OF DEPOSITING JURY FEES; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Notice-PI Settlement Conf & Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Notice (OF SERVICE OF THE COURT'S JULY 11, 2014 MINUTE ORDER RE:CONSOLIDATION AND DESIGNATION AS THE LEAD CASE RE: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. PAULA BERMUDEZ, ET AL. TC027362; ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Notice (OF SERVICE OF THE COUERT'S JULY 11 2014 MINUTE ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION AND TRANSFER TO DEPT. 91 RE: PAULA BERMUDES VS. ROLF BORCK KNUTSON, ET AL. BC508813;) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Notice (OF SERVICE OF THE COURT'S JULY 11, 2014 MINUTE ORDER RE:CONSOLIDATION AND TRANSFER TO DEPT. 91 BY ORDER OF THE COURT RE: ROLF BORCK KNUTSON VS. PAULA BERMUDEZ, ET AL. BC509512;) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2013
  • Notice (of deposit of jury fees ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Amended Answer to Complaint (FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF WORKERS COMPENSATION BENEFITS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • Acknowlgmt of Receipt (NOTICE AND... ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.