This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 05:55:10 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. JUAN CARLOS URBINA

Case Summary

On 10/14/2014 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against JUAN CARLOS URBINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA, WHITAKER, MICHAEL E, WHITAKER, MICHAEL E., WEGMAN, MARTIN and VILLEGAS, ANGELA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7220

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA

WHITAKER, MICHAEL E

WHITAKER, MICHAEL E.

WEGMAN, MARTIN

VILLEGAS, ANGELA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant and Respondent

URBINA JUAN CARLOS

Other and Not Classified By Court

BALCES MAYRA YANIRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPT.

 

Court Documents

Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

8/8/2017: Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

Declaration

8/8/2017: Declaration

Declaration - Income and Expense

8/8/2017: Declaration - Income and Expense

DSU - Request for Order (Change) - Driver License Release-Reserve Arrears Repayment And Stay All Collection Efforts-Release Bank Levy

8/8/2017: DSU - Request for Order (Change) - Driver License Release-Reserve Arrears Repayment And Stay All Collection Efforts-Release Bank Levy

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

8/16/2017: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

8/30/2017: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Responsive Declaration

9/11/2017: Responsive Declaration

Declaration - Income and Expense

9/25/2017: Declaration - Income and Expense

Proof of Service - Mail

9/25/2017: Proof of Service - Mail

Declaration - Income and Expense

9/25/2017: Declaration - Income and Expense

Minute Order

9/25/2017: Minute Order

DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

9/25/2017: DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

9/25/2017: DSU - Notice - Advisement of Rights FC4251(b)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

9/27/2017: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Order - After Hearing - 09-25-17

10/18/2017: Order - After Hearing - 09-25-17

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

11/27/2017: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

12/1/2017: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Minute Order

1/4/2018: Minute Order

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - No Fee (for 6/27/2019 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNotice - Rejection (of Stipulation and Order )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Docketat 8:00 AM in Department 2E, Villegas, Angela, Presiding; DSU - RFO (Modification Hearing) - Not Held - Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketResponsive Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketProof of Service (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Filed By Parent; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (Filed By Parent; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Child Custody and/or Visitation (Hearing Set; Filed By Parent; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketOrder (FCS - ATTEND MEDIATION APPT., Filed By Clerk; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketDeclaration (Filed By Parent; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted; Filed By Parent; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • DocketDSU - Judgment Packet Received - FC17430 (Approved; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • DocketComplaint/Summons - Governmental

    Read MoreRead Less