Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 07:45:14 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. EFREN GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against EFREN GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMIREZ, NANCY, DREWRY, ANTHONY B, DREWRY, ANTHONY, DREWRY, ANTHONY B., DURON, ARMANDO and HALEVY, LOUISE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5172

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMIREZ, NANCY

DREWRY, ANTHONY B

DREWRY, ANTHONY

DREWRY, ANTHONY B.

DURON, ARMANDO

HALEVY, LOUISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant and Respondent

GUTIERREZ EFREN

Other and Not Classified By Court

VANEGAS NANCY ARACELI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPT.

 

Court Documents

Order

5/2/2017: Order

Minute Order - Public

5/23/2017: Minute Order - Public

Minute Order

7/7/2017: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Mail

7/14/2017: Proof of Service - Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Docketat 9:00 AM in Department 2G, Duron, Armando, Presiding; Motion Hearing - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Docketat 9:00 AM in Central Civil West Dept. - 2G; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Docketat 9:00 AM in Central Civil West Dept. - 2G; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketOrder (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Docketat 9:00 AM in Central Civil West Dept. - 2G, Halevy, Louise, Presiding; Motion Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketDSU - RFO/MTN - Modification - Child Support (Hearing Set; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketDSU - RFO/MTN - Modification - Child Support (Hearing Set; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2012
  • Docketat 8:00 AM in Central Civil West Dept. - 2G, Drewry, Anthony B., Presiding; Motion Hearing - Judgment - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketDSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630 (Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • DocketNotice (Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • DocketDeclaration (Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • DocketNotice - Motion (Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgement of Receipt (Filed and Entered; Filed By Respondent in Pro per; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • DocketDSU - Answer - Complaint or Supplemental Complaint (FL 610) (Filed and Entered; Filed By Respondent in Pro per; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketDSU - Declaration - Amended Proposed Judgment (Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketComplaint/Summons - Governmental

    Read MoreRead Less