Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 07:46:11 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS. BERNARD ALEXANDER DRENTH

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against BERNARD ALEXANDER DRENTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5215

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant and Respondent

DRENTH BERNARD ALEXANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPT.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2015
  • Docketat 8:00 AM in Central Civil West Dept. - 2E, Temp Judge, Pro, Presiding; Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Off Calendar - Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2015
  • DocketRequest (to Withdraw Previously Filed Pleading and Certification, Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketMotion (Filed and Entered; Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment (Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketDSU - Request to Enter Default Judgment FL620 (Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence (Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DocketDSU - Judgment - Parental Obligations FL630 (Filed By Attorney for CSSD; )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DocketComplaint/Summons - Governmental

    Read MoreRead Less