This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 12:37:08 (UTC).

COSBEY WATSON JR ET AL VS LIM LINDA YAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2016 COSBEY WATSON JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LIM LINDA YAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0178

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

WATSON COSBEY JR.

WATSON LISANNE

Defendants and Respondents

JIAN AI

YUAN YUAN

YAN LIM LINDA

DOES 1 TO 50

Minor

WATSON HUNTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MARSHALL SILBERBERG

RYAN MICHAEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/15/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

2/21/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

DECLARATION OF WILLIAM S. COLLINS RE ORDER TOSHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

6/8/2018: DECLARATION OF WILLIAM S. COLLINS RE ORDER TOSHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order

6/18/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/27/2018: Minute Order

PETITON TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR

7/13/2018: PETITON TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR

DECLARATION OF WILLIAM S. COLLINS RE CONTINUED HEARING ON MINOR'S COMPROMISE; (PROPOSED) ORDER

7/13/2018: DECLARATION OF WILLIAM S. COLLINS RE CONTINUED HEARING ON MINOR'S COMPROMISE; (PROPOSED) ORDER

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

7/31/2018: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

7/31/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

Minute Order

8/6/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

8/7/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

8/28/2018: ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL, FORM MC-O53

9/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL, FORM MC-O53

Substitution of Attorney

9/18/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Notice

3/7/2019: Notice

Minute Order

6/5/2019: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

10/18/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

10/25/2017: Minute Order

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Notice (NOTICE OF FURTHER CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL); Filed by Cosbey, Jr. Watson (Plaintiff); Lisanne Watson (Plaintiff); Hunter Watson (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Notice of Continuance (of Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal); Filed by Cosbey, Jr. Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Declaration (of Michael J. Ryan Re Case Status on OSC Re Dismissal); Filed by Cosbey, Jr. Watson (Plaintiff); Hunter Watson (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Lisanne Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Cosbey, Jr. Watson (Plaintiff); Lisanne Watson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC620178    Hearing Date: September 22, 2020    Dept: 28

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Spring Street, Department 28

Cosbey Watson Jr., et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

Lim Linda Yan, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC620178

Hearing Date: None

RULING RE:

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action of a Minor, Hunter Watson, Age 15

Having reviewed the expedited petition to approve a compromise of pending action of minor, Hunter Watson (“Claimant”), age 15, filed on June 22, 2020, the Court finds the petition is properly approved.

Defendant Yuan Yuan is to pay Claimant $15,000.00 and Farmers Insurance (under an insured motorist policy) is to play Claimant $25,000.00, for a total gross settlement of $40,000.00. $6,250.00 of the gross settlement, which is just under 16% of the gross settlement, is to be paid in attorney’s fees. $335.65 of the gross settlement is to pay for costs.

All required attachments have been filed. The requested attorney’s fees are reasonable considering the work performed in this action. The requested costs are adequately explained.

Since the expedited petition filed on June 22, 2020 is properly approved, the Court denies the expedited petition filed on July 15, 2020. The only notable difference between the two petitions is the latter requests a hearing date. Considering the petition may be approved without a hearing during this COVID-era, the Court approves the June 22, 2020 petition and denies the July 15, 2020 petition as moot.

In sum, the expedited petition filed on June 22, 2020 is APPROVED. The expedited petition filed on July 15, 2020 is DENIED.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Dated:

__________________________________________________________

Hon. Daniel M. Crowley

Judge of the Superior Court