This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 04:25:13 (UTC).

CORNER CONSTRUCTION CO., INC. VS JEFFREY H. REICHWALD

Case Summary

On 10/13/2015 CORNER CONSTRUCTION CO , INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JEFFREY H REICHWALD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY L. NEWMAN and CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4858

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

NANCY L. NEWMAN

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNER CONSTRUCTION CO. INC.

Defendants

REICHWALD JEFFERY H.

REICHWALD JILL

SPELLMAN KEN

MARMOL COMPANY PAINTING & DECORATING

CJS WOODWORKING & DESIGN INC.

MOZUR INC.

G R MARBLE & TILE INC.

ROOF INTEGRITY

LEON & SON'S PLUMBING INC.

YANTZER BROTHERS HEATING AND AIR INC.

SAL-OYA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC

INTEGRITY ROOF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAMBURG KARIC EDWARDS&MARTIN

MARTIN GREGG A.

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON & TREGLIA

O'BRIEN JILLISA L.

Defendant Attorneys

SHAFFER GOLD & RUBAUM

GOLD BARRY I.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2017
  • at 08:32 AM in Department N; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Corner Construction Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Corner Construction Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Corner Construction Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Notice (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF LIS PENDENS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • at 09:01 AM in Department N; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • at 09:01 am in Department WEN, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Status Conference (RE ARBITRATION COMPLETION:) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2015
  • Motion (FOR ARBITRATION & STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING ARBITRATION; MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF BARRY I. GOLD, ESQ. & JEFFREY REICHWALD IN SUPPORT; & PROPOSED ORDER FILED CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Corner Construction Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Corner Construction Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Notice (OF PENDENCY OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Corner Construction Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Corner Construction Co., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GR MARBLE & TILE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MOZUR INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEON & SONS PLUMBING INC . is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLD BARRY IAN