This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2023 at 11:26:07 (UTC).

CORNEL GHERMAN VS CYLINDER ENTERPRISES INC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2016 CORNEL GHERMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CYLINDER ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2753

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GHERMAN CORNEL

Defendant

CYLINDER ENTERPRISES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL LEE GILMORE

Defendant Attorney

LEE VICTOR A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

2/21/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

 

Docket Entries

03/04/2019

DocketProceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Michelle Williams Court 8:30 am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2017

DocketProceeding/Event:Jury Trial Michelle Williams Court 8:30 am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2017

DocketProceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Michelle Williams Court 10:00 am

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2017

DocketDocument:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2017

DocketCase Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 354 Days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2016

DocketDocument:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2016

DocketDocument:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2016

DocketDocument:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2016

DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2016

DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2016

DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less