This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2016 at 23:28:20 (UTC).

CORINNE CHILD VS. MICHAEL DAVIS, M.D.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2012 CORINNE CHILD filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MICHAEL DAVIS, M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0678

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHILD CORINNE

CHILD CRAIG

Defendants

DAVIS MICHAEL M.D.

FRANCK'S LAB INC. A FL CORP. DBA

SAN GABRIEL AMBULATORY SURGERY CENTER

DBA FRANCK'S COMPOUNDING LAB

FRANCK PAUL

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEE BROWN & ASSOCIATES

BROWN & BROWN

Defendant Attorneys

BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE & NICHOLS

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

BEACH/WHITMAN/COWDREY LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

1/15/2014: NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

10/1/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/21/2013: NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

9/4/2013: Minute Order

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURI SDICTION INOT A GENERAL APPEARANCE - C.C.P ?418.1O)

7/18/2013: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURI SDICTION INOT A GENERAL APPEARANCE - C.C.P ?418.1O)

DEFENDANT MICHAEL DAVIS, M.D.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

4/4/2013: DEFENDANT MICHAEL DAVIS, M.D.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Minute Order

9/4/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT PAUL FRANCK?S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

9/6/2013: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT PAUL FRANCK?S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, FRANCK?S LAB, INC. DBA FRANCK?S COMPOUNDING LAB, TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/18/2013: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, FRANCK?S LAB, INC. DBA FRANCK?S COMPOUNDING LAB, TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Proof of Service

3/27/2013: Proof of Service

Unknown

7/12/2013: Unknown

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

9/4/2013: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

Minute Order

6/6/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

1/15/2014: NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

Unknown

6/7/2013: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/9/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

8/15/2013: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

Unknown

6/5/2013: Unknown

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Order (RE MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • Notice (of non-opposition ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (AS TO SAN GABRIEL AMBULATORY SURGERY CENTER ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • Partial Dismissal(not entire case) (AS TO DEFT. MICHAEL DAVIS M.D. ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2013
  • Motion to Quash Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • First Amended Complaint (SUMMONS ISSUED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.