This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 00:48:03 (UTC).

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC VS OLIVIER NAPA VALLEY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2015 CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OLIVIER NAPA VALLEY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0857

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

OLIVIER NAPA VALLEY INC.

T.J. MAXX OF CA LLC

TJX COMPANIES INC. THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YEROUSHALMI & YEROUSHALMI

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LESLIE MICHAEL ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

5/4/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PENALTY AND INJUNCTION

5/4/2015: COMPLAINT FOR PENALTY AND INJUNCTION

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/5/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/5/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/12/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/17/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/1/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

7/1/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING; NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/8/2015: NOTICE OF RULING; NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS OLIVIER NAPA VALLEY, INC., THE TJX COMPANIES, INC. AND T.J. MAXX OF CA, LLC TO PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC.'S COMPLAINT

7/21/2015: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS OLIVIER NAPA VALLEY, INC., THE TJX COMPANIES, INC. AND T.J. MAXX OF CA, LLC TO PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC.'S COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/31/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/1/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

9/15/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order

9/15/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE

9/17/2015: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE

Minute Order

2/3/2016: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE

3/7/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL MARCUS IN SUPPORT MOTION TO APPROVE AND ENTER CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC. AND DEFENDANT OLIVIER NAPA VALLEY, INC.

3/7/2016: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL MARCUS IN SUPPORT MOTION TO APPROVE AND ENTER CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFF CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC. AND DEFENDANT OLIVIER NAPA VALLEY, INC.

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2016
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 69; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO APPROVE AND ENTER CONSENT JUDGMENT BETWEEN CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP, INC. AND OLIVIER NAPA VALLEY, INC. ET AL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • NOTICE ENTRY JUDGMENT/ORDER FILING DISMISS & PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • at 10:20 AM in Department 69; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • CONSENT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Judgment; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR PENALTY AND INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Consumer Advocacy Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T.J. MAXX OF CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSUMER ADVOCACY GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The TJX Companies, Inc. d/b/a T.J.Maxx is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LESLIE MICHAEL ESQ.