This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 17:14:48 (UTC).

CONSUELO HERNANDEZ VS AURORA BANK FSB ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/22/2015 CONSUELO HERNANDEZ filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against AURORA BANK FSB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0074

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ CONSUELO

Defendants

AURORA BANK FSB

CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN T. STUART ATTNY AT LAW

Defendant Attorney

GREEN & HALL A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE; ETC

1/22/2015: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE; ETC

SUMMONS

1/22/2015: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/20/2015: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/20/2015: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS AURORA BANK, FSB, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE OF RALI SERIES 2006-Q04 TRUST, AND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF CONSU

3/2/2015: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS AURORA BANK, FSB, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE OF RALI SERIES 2006-Q04 TRUST, AND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF CONSU

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/24/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/24/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/24/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/24/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANTS AURORA BANK, FSB, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE OF RAIL SERIES 2006-.Q04 TRUST, AND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. FOR JUDG

4/30/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANTS AURORA BANK, FSB, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE OF RAIL SERIES 2006-.Q04 TRUST, AND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. FOR JUDG

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

4/30/2015: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/21/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PLALNTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

5/26/2015: PLALNTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/28/2015: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

5/28/2015: DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

RULING

6/8/2015: RULING

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/8/2015: NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

6/8/2015: Minute Order

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2017
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 20; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20; Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Consuelo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 20; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (MOTION-JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Aurora Bank, FSB (Defendant); Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Defendant); Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANTS AURORA BANK, FSB, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE OF RALI SERIES 2006-Q04 TRUST, AND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF CONSUELO HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. WRONGFUL FORECLOSURE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Consuelo Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

GREEN&HALL ATTORNEYS AT LAW A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

wn A WN

O 00 3 O

GREEN & HALL, A Professional Corporation HOWARD D. HALL, State Bar No. 145024 AUSTIN BAILLIO, State Bar No. 274535 1851 East First Street 10" Floor

Santa Ana, Cahforma 92705-4052

Telephone: (714) 918-7000

Facsimile: (714) 918-6996

Attorneys for Defendants AURORA BANK, FSB, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, as Trustee of RALI SERIES 2006- Q04 TRUST, and MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

Supai’ior Court Of California County Of Los Angeles

JUL 28 2015

ot 1k, vaner,_execpiys Officer/Clerk B Depu ’ y—é% 0 oy _§ /

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

CONSUELO HERNANDEZ, an Individual, Plaintiff, VS.

AURORA BANK, FSB, a Federal Savings Bank; DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, a New York Corporation as Trustee of RALI SERIES 2006-Q04 TRUST, a securitized trust formed in the State of New York; MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC,, a Delaware Corporation; CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION, a California Corporation; and DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE,

Defendants.

TO ALL PARTIES AND TO THEIR COUNSEL OF RECORD: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT on November 4, 2015, at 8: 30 a.m., or

thereafter as counsel may be heard, in DEPT. 20 of the above- -captioned Court located §fi 111

CASE NO. BC570074

[Assigned for all purposes to Dept. 20, the Hon. Dalila Corral Lyons presiding]

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF

AURORA BANK, FSB, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY,

AS TRUSTEE OF RALI SERIES 2006-

Q04 TRUST, AND MORTGAGE

ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION

SYSTEMS, INC. FOR JUDGMENT ON

THE PLEADINGS (FIRST AMENDED

COMPLAINT); MEMORANDUM OF

POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

DATE: November 4, 2015 TIME: 8:30 a.m. DEPT.. 20

ACTION FILED: TRIAL DATE:

£SO H 14T #4309 3SHI LI

o@? Nee faggho

FL00L503

North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012, Aurora Bank, FSB (“Aurora”), Deutsche Ean"k

National Trust Company, as Trustee of Rali Series 2006-Q04 Trust (&’DBNfl‘ ”) an@Mortgage

C"—"f"(:l p—o- QO o (o]

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Aurora Bank FSB is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant