This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2016 at 13:32:06 (UTC).

CONNYE THOMAS VS. DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING CO.

Case Summary

On 07/11/2012 CONNYE THOMAS filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, GREGORY KEOSIAN, DAVID SOTELO, ELIA WEINBACH and LAURA C. ELLISON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7442

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

DAVID SOTELO

ELIA WEINBACH

LAURA C. ELLISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS CONNYE

Defendants

DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAVAHERIAN & RUSZECKI P.C.

Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY & GMELICH

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, I.L.C.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET TWO); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST P

5/8/2013: DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, I.L.C.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET TWO); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST P

DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED F{ESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS &GAINST PLAINTIFF AN

5/8/2013: DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED F{ESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS &GAINST PLAINTIFF AN

Minute Order

7/1/2013: Minute Order

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF G. DEAN GUERRERO, ESQ.

7/1/2013: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF G. DEAN GUERRERO, ESQ.

NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION V CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN

7/5/2013: NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION V CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN

DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF, CONNYE THOMAS TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET

7/30/2013: DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF, CONNYE THOMAS TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET

DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF, CONNYE THOMAS TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO) AND RE

7/30/2013: DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF, CONNYE THOMAS TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO) AND RE

RULING RE: 1. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS ETC.

8/5/2013: RULING RE: 1. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS ETC.

Minute Order

8/5/2013: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO), REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET TWO), AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS A

8/13/2013: NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO), REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET TWO), AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS A

Minute Order

10/23/2013: Minute Order

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONFIRM THE COURT?S JULY 1, 2013 ORDER AND CONTINUING THE TRIAL TO MARCH 20, 2014 ALONG WITH ALL ASSOCIATED HEARING AND CUT-OFF DATES

10/23/2013: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONFIRM THE COURT?S JULY 1, 2013 ORDER AND CONTINUING THE TRIAL TO MARCH 20, 2014 ALONG WITH ALL ASSOCIATED HEARING AND CUT-OFF DATES

NOTICE OF EX PARTE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONFIRM THE COURT?S JULY 1, 2013 ORDER AND CONTINUING THE TRIAL TO MARCH 20, 2014 ETC.

10/23/2013: NOTICE OF EX PARTE AND EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONFIRM THE COURT?S JULY 1, 2013 ORDER AND CONTINUING THE TRIAL TO MARCH 20, 2014 ETC.

NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONFIRM THE COURT?S JULY 1, 2013 ORDER VACATING THE DECEMBER 3, 2013 TRIAL DATE AND CON

10/28/2013: NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONFIRM THE COURT?S JULY 1, 2013 ORDER VACATING THE DECEMBER 3, 2013 TRIAL DATE AND CON

DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S SEPARATE STATEMENT ETC.

11/27/2013: DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S SEPARATE STATEMENT ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ETC.

11/27/2013: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ETC.

COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S MOTION ETC.

11/27/2013: COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.?S MOTION ETC.

PLAINTIFF CONNYE THOMAS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO JUDICIAL FORM INTERROGATOR1ES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONS, AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; REQUEST

12/6/2013: PLAINTIFF CONNYE THOMAS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO JUDICIAL FORM INTERROGATOR1ES, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONS, AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; REQUEST

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs ($3150.30 ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2014
  • DocketOSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • DocketNotice-Settlement Filed by Plaintiff in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • DocketOrder (RULING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S RETAINED EXPERTS FOR THEIR SECOND FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THEIR DEPOSITIONS . DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST) Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • DocketNotice (OF ERRATA ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • DocketNotice of Motion Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Order Precluding Plaintiff's Retained Experts from Testifying at Trial for Second Failure to Attend Depositions ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • DocketEx-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S RETAINED EXPERTS FOR THEIR SECOND FAILURE TO APPEAR FOR THEIR DEPOSITIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE MULTIPLE EXPARTE APPLICATIONS OF JUNE 12, 2014 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • DocketEx-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S VERIFIED ANSWERS TO JUDICIAL FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET THREE) AND SPECIAL INTERROGS (SET FOUR) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • DocketReceipt - General (CIVIL DEPOSIT-JURY FEES POSTED BY DEFT. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2012
  • DocketStatement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • DocketDemurrer (DEFT. (DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, LLC) ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • DocketMotion to Strike Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (party served: del amo fashion center operating company, llc ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

M D o Ty ls:’ e

ek ek e

W N = P

© @ N & W s W N

BRADLEY & GMELICH LLP

700 North Brand Boulevard, 10™ Floor Glendale, California 91203-1202 Telephone: (818) 243-5200 Facsimile: (818) 243-5266 FEB 26 2017 m IL‘. ! Attorneys for Defendant, DEL AMO FASHION ‘hered R, Cgrter, Buecutive Qffteer2aet CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C. py_ & Jemm2 > Deyaty - S S . . 77 Glortena Robimson |

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT CONNYE THOMAS, Case No. YC067442 Plaintiff, - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT, DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN VSs. THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY

- ADJUDICATION AS TO PLAINTIFF’S

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND

DEL AMO FASHION CENTER AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF OPERATING COMPANY, L.L.C.,a DARREN P. SALUTE, ESQ. DELAWARE CORPORATION; and DOES 1 to 50, Inclusive, [Filed Concurrently with Separate Siatement of Undisputed Material Facts and Supporting Defendants. Evidence; Compendium of Exhibits] Reservation ID: 161115174411 Date: May 15, 2017 Time: 1:30 p.m. Dept.: 91 (Assigned to Hon. Patricia Nieto, Dept. 91) Complaint Filed: - 07/11/2012 Discovery Cutoff: 05/31/2017 Motion Cutoff: 06/15/2017 Tnal Date: 06/30/2017

TO ALL PARTIES AND TO THEIR COUNSEL OF RECORD: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT on May 15, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., or as soon thereaftef as

counsel may be heard, in Department 91 of the above-captioned Court, located at 111 North Hill

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY LLC. is a litigant