This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2016 at 17:14:26 (UTC).

CONNIE GORDEN-CAVE VS RONALD JOHN BARTRAM

Case Summary

On 06/13/2013 CONNIE GORDEN-CAVE filed an Other lawsuit against RONALD JOHN BARTRAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM D. STEWART, LAURA A. MATZ and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1648

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM D. STEWART

LAURA A. MATZ

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CONNIE GORDEN-CAVE

GORDEN-CAVE CONNIE

GORDON-CAVE CONNIE

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

BARTRAM BEVERLY

BARTRAM RONALD JOHN

BEVERLY BARTRAM

RONALD JOHN BARTRAM

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

GORDON-CAVE CONNIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PAUL S. LEVINE

LAW OFFICE OF PAUL S. LEVINE

LEVINE PAUL S. ESQ.

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEVINE PAUL S. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BATES JAMES W.

BATES JAMES W. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BATES JAMES W. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEAL(UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

7/5/2016: NOTICE OF APPEAL(UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/24/2014: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

APPEILANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

7/15/2016: APPEILANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS RONALD JOHN BARTRAM AND BEVERLY BARTRAM

10/31/2013: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS RONALD JOHN BARTRAM AND BEVERLY BARTRAM

INENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS RONALD JOHN BARTRAN AND BEVERLY BARTFL

4/11/2014: INENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS RONALD JOHN BARTRAN AND BEVERLY BARTFL

Minute Order

7/3/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER (1) COMPELLING RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 2030.290(B), (2) COMPELLING RESPONSE TO INSPECTI

6/11/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER (1) COMPELLING RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 2030.290(B), (2) COMPELLING RESPONSE TO INSPECTI

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/24/2014: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANTS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF ELECTROMC SERVICE

1/3/2014: PROOF OF ELECTROMC SERVICE

NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS RONALD JOHN BARTRAM AND BEVERLY B.ARTRAN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/18/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS RONALD JOHN BARTRAM AND BEVERLY B.ARTRAN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/15/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING THE HEARING CALENDARED FOR JULY 9, 2014)

7/3/2014: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND VACATING ALL FUTURE DATES CALENDARED IN PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURT (INCLUDING THE HEARING CALENDARED FOR JULY 9, 2014)

NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMTED JURISDICTION)

7/8/2016: NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMTED JURISDICTION)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/15/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

COMPLAINT - PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

8/15/2013: COMPLAINT - PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS RONALD JOHN BARTRAM AND BEVERLY BARTRAM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/18/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS RONALD JOHN BARTRAM AND BEVERLY BARTRAM; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/13/2013: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER: (1) THAT ADMISSIONS BE DEEMED ADMITTED, (2) FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF CONNIE GORDEN-CAVE AND PAUL S. LEVINE, HER ATTORNEY OF RECORD, JOINTLY AND S

6/11/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER: (1) THAT ADMISSIONS BE DEEMED ADMITTED, (2) FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF CONNIE GORDEN-CAVE AND PAUL S. LEVINE, HER ATTORNEY OF RECORD, JOINTLY AND S

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2016
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Stipulation (TO CONTINUE TRIAL ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application (FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAMES W. BATES ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Objection (OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S PROFERRED EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR SU) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Reply (DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTSS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES ON) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Separate Statement (OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS ) Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • General Denial Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2014
  • Motion for an Order Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Proof of Service (OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Notice (Amended notice of Demurrer; ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Notice (of Amended M/to Strike; ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • Defendant's Demurrer Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • Motion to Strike Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • First Amended Complaint Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2013
  • Proof-Service/Summons ((2) Bartram, Ronald John Bartram, Beverly ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.