This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 13:09:08 (UTC).

COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC VS REGAL MEDICAL

Case Summary

On 06/09/2016 COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against REGAL MEDICAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3311

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Defendant

COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

REGAL MEDICAL GROUP INC.

HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

ROY.M.D. ROSALINDA

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC.

LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION A MEDICAL GROUP

MENZER LAWRENCE

SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP INC.

TAMASHIRO VICTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF CRAIG S STEINBERG

STEINBERG CRAIG S

Defendant Attorneys

TORRES PAUL MICHAEL

ROY RAJ D

AMIR MICHAEL M

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS REGAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC., HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK, INC., SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, INC. AND LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION, A MEDICAL GROUP, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF D

3/16/2018: DEFENDANTS REGAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC., HERITAGE PROVIDER NETWORK, INC., SIERRA MEDICAL GROUP, INC. AND LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION, A MEDICAL GROUP, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF D

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CRAIG STEINBERG

4/27/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CRAIG STEINBERG

STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE

5/7/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE

REPLY TO OPPOSITION BY ROSALINDA ROY TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/9/2018: REPLY TO OPPOSITION BY ROSALINDA ROY TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

SECOND AMENDED SUMMONS

5/24/2018: SECOND AMENDED SUMMONS

Minute Order

6/8/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT ROY MEDICAL GROUP'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAI GROUP IPA, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC

6/20/2018: DEFENDANT ROY MEDICAL GROUP'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAI GROUP IPA, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC

NOTICE OF ORDER

6/29/2018: NOTICE OF ORDER

OPPOSITIONS BY COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC., TO DEMURRERS BY ROY MEDICAL GROUP

9/4/2018: OPPOSITIONS BY COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC., TO DEMURRERS BY ROY MEDICAL GROUP

Order

10/5/2018: Order

Minute Order

12/5/2018: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS; ETC.

6/9/2016: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS; ETC.

Unknown

9/27/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF FILING OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE ETC.

11/7/2016: NOTICE OF FILING OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE ETC.

FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES UNDER CALIFORNIA BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE ? 17200, ET SEQ.; ETC.

11/29/2016: FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES UNDER CALIFORNIA BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE ? 17200, ET SEQ.; ETC.

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

2/6/2017: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

CONSOLIDATED DECLARATION OF JAMIE 0. KENDALL IN SUPPORT DEFENDANT REGAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC.'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE AND FORM I

2/21/2017: CONSOLIDATED DECLARATION OF JAMIE 0. KENDALL IN SUPPORT DEFENDANT REGAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC.'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE AND FORM I

NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; AND NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT STATUS CONFERENCE

3/2/2017: NOTICE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; AND NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT STATUS CONFERENCE

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Heritage Provider Network, Inc. (Defendant); Regal Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( FOR RULING RELATING CASES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE CONCERNING WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED; DECLARATION OF PAUL TORRES) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( to Deem Cases Related) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR RULING RELATING CASES OR...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Opposition (to Ex Parte Application to Relate Cases); Filed by Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Michael M Amir (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Response (to Community Family Care Medical Group IPA Inc's response and Opposition to the Notice of Related Cases filed by Roy Medical Group); Filed by Roy Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Opposition (to Notice of Related Cases); Filed by Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
243 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2016
  • ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Answer; Filed by Heritage Provider Network, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF DEMURRERS AND DEMURRERS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT BY REGAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC., ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Demurrer; Filed by Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Regal Medical Group, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) UNFAIR BUSINESS PRACTICES UNDER CALIFORNIA BUSINESS & PROFESSIONS CODE 17200, ET SEQ.; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Regal Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC623311    Hearing Date: March 8, 2021    Dept: 52

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants Regal Medical Group, Inc., Heritage Provider Network, Inc., Sierra Medical Group, Inc., and Lakeside Medical Organization, A Medical Group, Inc.’s Application to Seal Exhibits 12, 19-25 in Support of Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment

The court having read the papers and there being no opposition rules as follows:

Defendants seek to seal the entirety of exhibits 12 and 19 to 25 in support of their motion for summary judgment. Exhibits 12 is plaintiff’s sample provider agreement. Exhibits 19-21 are portions of Heritage Provider Network’s delegation agreements with the medical group defendants. Exhibit 22 is the primary care agreement between Dr. Lawrence Menzer and Regal. Exhibit 23 is the MA Downstream Provider contract addendum between Dr. Menzer and Regal. Exhibit 24 is a sample contract that reflects the financial terms defendants offered to physicians for providing care to Medi-Cal members. Finally, exhibit 25 is a one-page sample “Choice Letter” from physicians to patients sent when the physicians move to a different Independent Physicians Association.

CRC 2.550(d) provides:

A court may order that a record be filed under seal only if it expressly finds facts that establish:

(1) There exists an overriding interest that overcomes the right of public access to the record;

(2) The overriding interest supports sealing the record;

(3) A substantial probability exists that the overriding interest will be prejudiced if the record is not sealed;

(4) The proposed sealing is narrowly tailored; and

(5) No less restrictive means exist to achieve the overriding interest.

“[C]onfidential matters relating to the business operations of defendant” can constitute an overriding interest that justifies sealing of records when “public revelation of [the] matters would interfere with its ability to effectively compete in the marketplace… .” (Universal City Studios, Inc. v. Super. Ct. (2003) 110 Cal.App.4th 1273, 1286.)

Defendants fail to provide facts establishing that the potential overriding interest supports sealing the record. They do not explain what exactly in these exhibits constitutes a confidential matter and why public disclosure would interfere with the parties’ businesses.

Even if defendants established the first three elements, they do not meet the final two elements. Rather than sealing the entirety of these exhibits, defendants could redact the sensitive portions. Any overriding interest applies only to some sections of the exhibits. For example, not all of the numerous definitions in Exhibits 12 and 19-23 are confidential business information.

The motion is DENIED without prejudice.

Please contact Department 52 at SMCDEPT52@lacourt.org to advise the courtroom staff if parties are submitting on the court’s tentative ruling. Please provide the Case Name, Case Number, and party.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION A MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant