This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 01:04:21 (UTC).

COLLINS, LEWIS - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 COLLINS, LEWIS - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KLEIN, CLIFFORD. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6019

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KLEIN, CLIFFORD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SERGI ROBIN L.

Decedent

COLLINS LEWIS

Not Classified By Court

CITY L. GLENN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MENDLOVITZ SIDNEY

 

Court Documents

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

4/6/2017: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

Minute Order

3/13/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/27/2018: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement

8/22/2018: Supplement - Supplement

Notice - Notice to Franchise Tax Board

10/18/2017: Notice - Notice to Franchise Tax Board

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

11/10/2016: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Order - Ex Parte Order re Publication

5/15/2018: Order - Ex Parte Order re Publication

Supplement - Supplement

8/22/2018: Supplement - Supplement

Order - Quieting Title

10/19/2018: Order - Quieting Title

Minute Order

2/7/2018: Minute Order

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

1/23/2017: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Minute Order

3/13/2018: Minute Order

Supplement - Second Supplement

8/24/2018: Supplement - Second Supplement

Ex Parte - Petition - Ex Parte Petition re Publication

4/20/2018: Ex Parte - Petition - Ex Parte Petition re Publication

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

7/16/2018: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

11/6/2018: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

3/6/2017: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Summons - Summons

11/29/2017: Summons - Summons

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • TERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Order (Quieting Title )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Order (Directing Final Distribution on Waiver of Account, and Allowing Statutory Attorney Fees )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Authority Hearing (Non-Trust) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Petition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2017
  • in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Supplement (First to Petition For Letters Of Administration, Etc.. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Notice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • in Probate Department 9, Klein, Clifford, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less