This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 08:49:26 (UTC).

CLEMENTINA ABARCA VS BARON HR LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2016 CLEMENTINA ABARCA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BARON HR LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9386

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ABARCA CLEMENTINA

Defendants and Respondents

BARON HR LLC

DOES 1-20

HARINGA INC.

PREMIER PACKAGING AND ASSEMBLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RAMIN R. YOUNESSI A.P.L.C

YOUNESSI RAMIN R. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DOMINGUEZ DARIN R. ESQ.

PURCELL BYRON MICHAEL ESQ.

WELCH ERIC M.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/2/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

COMPLAINT 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV?T CODE ?1294O ET SEQ.; ETC

5/4/2016: COMPLAINT 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV?T CODE ?1294O ET SEQ.; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/13/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/21/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/31/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

11/23/2016: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF CLEMENTINA ABARCA TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO HARINGA INC.?S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM

2/14/2017: PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF CLEMENTINA ABARCA TO PROVIDE FURTHER RESPONSES TO HARINGA INC.?S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM

DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT BARON HR, LLC'S ANSWERS TO: (1) FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL, SET ONE; (2) FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT LAW, SET ONE; (

2/17/2017: DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT BARON HR, LLC'S ANSWERS TO: (1) FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL, SET ONE; (2) FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT LAW, SET ONE; (

DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT BARON HR, LLC'S RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; ETC

2/17/2017: DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT BARON HR, LLC'S RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE; ETC

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

4/26/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

4/26/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL AND THE MOTION/DISCOVERY RELATED DEADLINES; DECLARATION OF RAMIN VOUNESSI

7/5/2017: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL AND THE MOTION/DISCOVERY RELATED DEADLINES; DECLARATION OF RAMIN VOUNESSI

DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MOTION/DISCOVERY RELATED DEADLINES

7/5/2017: DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S EX PARTE TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MOTION/DISCOVERY RELATED DEADLINES

PLAINTIFF CLEMENTINA ABARCA'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST BARON HR, LLC

9/5/2017: PLAINTIFF CLEMENTINA ABARCA'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST BARON HR, LLC

DENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST BARON HR, LLC

9/11/2017: DENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST BARON HR, LLC

DEPARTMENT 53 LAW AND MOTION RULINGS

10/10/2017: DEPARTMENT 53 LAW AND MOTION RULINGS

Minute Order

10/11/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/19/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2018
  • Request for Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE COMPLAINT ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Proof of Service (ON CROSS-COMPLAINT ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 53, Howard L. Halm, Presiding; Motion for Leave - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Order (ON LAW AND MOTION RULING; ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Cross-complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • at 08:29 am in Department 53, Howard L. Halm, Presiding; Motion for Leave - Continued by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Notice (of non-opp to its mtn for leave to file cross-complaint against Baron HR, LLC ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2016
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Notice (RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUANCE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Notice of Continuance (*CONTINUING CMC FROM 9/1/16 TO 9/19/16 ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Answer (ANSWER ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Notice of Reassignment and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Court Attendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/1961
  • Motion to Quash (OR MODIFY OVERBROAD MEDICAL RECORDS SUBPOENA ISSUED BY DEFENDANT HARINGA, INC. TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA IMMEDIATE MEDICAL CENTER; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST....); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less