This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 02:11:20 (UTC).

CLAUD TOWNSLEY, INC., VS. APPLIED UNDER WRITERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2016 CLAUD TOWNSLEY, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against APPLIED UNDER WRITERS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8585

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLAUD TOWNSLEY INC.

CENTRAL ROOFING CO.

Defendants

APPLIED RISK SERVICES INC.

APPLIED UNDER WRITERS INC.

APPLIED UNDER WRITERS CAPTIVE RISK

DOES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

CALIFORNIA INSURNACE COMPANY

RISK APPLIED UNDER WRITERS CAPTIVE

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARMER SMITH & LANE LLP

Defendant Attorney

CASTLE JAMES C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (W/OUT PREJUDICE OF THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by CLAUD TOWNSLEY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department B; (Order to Show Cause; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • at 09:00 am in Department B, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARYINJUNCTION) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department B; (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • at 09:00 am in Department B, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARYINJUNCTION) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Declaration; Filed by APPLIED UNDER WRITERS, INC. (Defendant); APPLIED UNDER WRITERS CAPTIVE RISK (Defendant); CALIFORNIA INSURNACE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Declaration (OF TRAVIS J. KOCH IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS' OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by CLAUD TOWNSLEY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons (PARTY SERVED: CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons (party served: applied risk services, inc. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by CLAUD TOWNSLEY, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less