This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 03:36:07 (UTC).

CAMILLE CLARK VS. AUDIE CHAMBERLAIN

Case Summary

On 02/05/2016 CAMILLE CLARK filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AUDIE CHAMBERLAIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1829

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LOPEZ-GISS, SUSAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLARK CAMILLE

Respondent

CHAMBERLAIN AUDIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

STERNBERG CAROL

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2017
  • Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Chamberlain, Audie ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Proof of Service (POS-040 (Civil) - On Behalf of: Respondent: Chamberlain, Audie ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Judgment (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Chamberlain, Audie - Signed on 2017-01-31 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Chamberlain, Audie - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-31 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Order (CLERK'S DECLARATION RE: SEARCH AND TO DEEM COPY AS ORIGINAL FOR AMENDED PETITION - Signed on 2017-01-19 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Order (CLERK'S DECLARATION RE: SEARCH TO DEEM COPY AS ORIGINAL FOR PROOF OF SERVICE - Signed on 2017-01-19 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • 2nd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 12-15-16 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Chamberlain, Audie ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2016
  • Petition-Amended (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Clark, Camille ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Substitution of Attorney (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Clark, Camille ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Clark, Camille ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Miscellaneous (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - Filed By: Petitioner: Clark, Camille ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- Filed By: Petitioner: Clark, Camille ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F46 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Clark, Camille ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Summons (- Filed By: Petitioner: Clark, Camille ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Petition (- Filed By: Petitioner: Clark, Camille ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Clark, Camille ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROL