This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:26:42 (UTC).

CLARA MUNIZ ET AL VS ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2013 CLARA MUNIZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, AMY D. HOGUE and H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5746

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

AMY D. HOGUE

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MUNIZ AGUSTIN

MUNIZ CLARA

MUNIZ JOSEPHINE

MUNIZ STELLA

SAUCEDA SALLY

Defendants and Respondents

ALTA HOLLYWOOD HOSPITALS INC.

ALTA HOSPITAL SYSTEM LLC

ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC

CHE JULIE

CROCKETT VON

CULVER EMERGENCY MEDICAL GROUP

DOES 1 TO 100

HOLLYWOOD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

KHOSSOUSSI FARHAD M.D.

MAYWETHER YVONNE M.D.

OFOEGBU KINGSLEY M.D.

PROSPECT MEDICAL HOLDINGS INC.

ROBLES LESLIE

SCHNEIDER BARBARA

SHEHU AMINATU J.

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

OWEN GREGORY J. ESQ.

OWEN GREGORY JAMES

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD STOCKAPLER

HOFFMAN BRIAN L. ESQ.

BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE & NICHOL

DRAKE KENNETH W.

SUSSON & PARRETT

CARROLL KELLY TROTTER FRANZEN MCKENNA ETC

RUSHFELDT SHELLEY & DRAKE

STOCKALPER PATRICK E. ESQ

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN

BEACH WHITMAN & COWDREY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

7/19/2013: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WRONGFUL DEATH; ETC

7/19/2013: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WRONGFUL DEATH; ETC

DECLARATION OF SALLY SAUCEDA PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVJL PROCEDURE ? 377.11,377.22 AND 377.60

9/5/2013: DECLARATION OF SALLY SAUCEDA PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVJL PROCEDURE ? 377.11,377.22 AND 377.60

DECLARATION OF JOSEPHINE MUNIZ PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 377.11, 377.22 AND 377.60

9/5/2013: DECLARATION OF JOSEPHINE MUNIZ PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 377.11, 377.22 AND 377.60

DECLARATION OF CLARA MUNIZ PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 377.11,377.22 AND 377.60

9/5/2013: DECLARATION OF CLARA MUNIZ PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 377.11,377.22 AND 377.60

DECLARATION OF STELLA MUNIZ PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 377.11,377.22 AND 377.60

9/5/2013: DECLARATION OF STELLA MUNIZ PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 377.11,377.22 AND 377.60

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DBA HOLLYWOOD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AT BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER

9/13/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DBA HOLLYWOOD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AT BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, JULIE CHE

9/24/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT, JULIE CHE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/4/2013: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANTS ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. D.B.A HOLLYWOOD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AT BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTLFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMO

10/4/2013: DEFENDANTS ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM, LLC; SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. D.B.A HOLLYWOOD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AT BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTLFFS? COMPLAINT; MEMO

REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

10/4/2013: REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

DEFENDANTS ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTE LLC; SOUTHERN CALIFORMA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. D.B.A. HOLLYWOOD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AT BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT;

10/4/2013: DEFENDANTS ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTE LLC; SOUTHERN CALIFORMA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC. D.B.A. HOLLYWOOD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AT BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT;

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

10/16/2013: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

10/16/2013: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, ALTA HOLLYWOOD HOSPITAL, INC. DBA BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER?S, MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

10/24/2013: PLAINTIFFS? NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, ALTA HOLLYWOOD HOSPITAL, INC. DBA BROTMAN MEDICAL CENTER?S, MOTION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS? DECLARATIONS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ?377.11, 377.22 AND 377.60

11/8/2013: PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS? DECLARATIONS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ?377.11, 377.22 AND 377.60

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

12/5/2013: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

12/5/2013: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Clara Muniz (Plaintiff); Agustin Muniz (Plaintiff); Sally Sauceda (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNotice-Settlement (unconditional ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Clara Muniz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Yvonne M.D. Maywether (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Alta Hospital System, LLC (Defendant); Alta Hollywood Hospitals, Inc. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P&S Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (Complaint as to Defts Aminatu J. Shehu MD, Yvonne Maywether MD, and Culver Emergency Medical Group only ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
643 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2013
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JOSEPHINE MUNIZ PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.11, 377.22 AND 377.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SALLY SAUCEDA PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVJL PROCEDURE 377.11,377.22 AND 377.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION OF CLARA MUNIZ PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.11,377.22 AND 377.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION OF AGUSTIN MUNIZ PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.11,377.22 AND 377.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION OF STELLA MUNIZ PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.11,377.22 AND 377.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. WRONGFUL DEATH; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Clara Muniz (Plaintiff); Agustin Muniz (Plaintiff); Sally Sauceda (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less