This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2019 at 02:23:35 (UTC).

CITY OF SANTA MONICA VS. ARB,INC.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2013 CITY OF SANTA MONICA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARB,INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, MICHELLE R. ROSENBLATT and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9923

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

MICHELLE R. ROSENBLATT

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SANTA MONICA CITY OF

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ARB INC.

INTERNATIONAL PARKIN DESIGN INC.

WOODBRIDGE GLASS INC.

Cross Defendants

ARB STRUCTURES INC.

SURFACE PRODUCTS INC.

MOORE RUBLE YUDELL ARCHITECTS & PLANNERS

YEHIA DANIEL; MOE 1

YEHIA DANIEL

INTERNATIONAL PARKIN DESIGN INC.

WOODBRIDGE GLASS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GAMS LANCE S. ESQ.

GAMS LANCE S.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

RUTAN & TUCKER

RUTAN & TUCKER LLP

NICHOLS STEVEN A. ESQ

Cross Defendant Attorneys

ROSS WERSCHING & WOLCOTT LLP

LEGASPI CATHERINE ESQ.

SCHWARTZ STEVEN H. ESQ.

ERICKSON MARK D. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

MCCONNELL JOHN W. III ESQ.

JOHN C. GRAY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/29/2013: SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Unknown

8/7/2013: Unknown

NOTICE OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON MOORE RUBLE YUDELL ARCHITECTS & PLANNERS

12/23/2013: NOTICE OF PERSONAL SERVICE ON MOORE RUBLE YUDELL ARCHITECTS & PLANNERS

)ECLARATION OF STEVEN J GOON IN IJPPORT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSSOMPLAINANT ARB, INC.?S MOTION OR LEAVE TO FILE CROSSOMPLAINT AGAINST CROSS)EFENDANT INTERNATTONAL ARKING DESIGN, INC.

4/1/2014: )ECLARATION OF STEVEN J GOON IN IJPPORT OF DEFENDANT AND CROSSOMPLAINANT ARB, INC.?S MOTION OR LEAVE TO FILE CROSSOMPLAINT AGAINST CROSS)EFENDANT INTERNATTONAL ARKING DESIGN, INC.

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/12/2014: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order

7/8/2014: Minute Order

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 411.35]

8/27/2014: CERTIFICATE OF MERIT (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 411.35]

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT;

9/29/2014: NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT;

SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WOODBRIDGE GLASS, INC.

10/7/2014: SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WOODBRIDGE GLASS, INC.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

12/9/2014: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

OPPOSITION OF CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT WOODBRIDGE GLASS, INC. TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CROSS-DEFENDANT SURFACE PRODUCTS, INC.

2/10/2015: OPPOSITION OF CROSS-DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT WOODBRIDGE GLASS, INC. TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CROSS-DEFENDANT SURFACE PRODUCTS, INC.

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SPECIALLY-APPEARING CROSS-DEFENDANT DANNY YEHIA TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WOODBRIDGE GLASS, INC.

2/18/2015: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF SPECIALLY-APPEARING CROSS-DEFENDANT DANNY YEHIA TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WOODBRIDGE GLASS, INC.

DECLARATION OF WILLIAM C. O'NEILL SUPPORTING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY SPECIALLY-APPEARING CROSS- DEFENDANT SURFACE PRODUCTS, INC. TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT OF

2/18/2015: DECLARATION OF WILLIAM C. O'NEILL SUPPORTING REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY SPECIALLY-APPEARING CROSS- DEFENDANT SURFACE PRODUCTS, INC. TO SECOND AMENDED CROSS- COMPLAINT OF

NOTICE OF RULING FROM TRLAL SETTING CONFERENCE

2/26/2015: NOTICE OF RULING FROM TRLAL SETTING CONFERENCE

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/2/2015: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF CROSSDEFENDANTS SURFACE PRODUCTS, INC. AND DANNY YEHIA FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS CONCERNING THE THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WOODBRIDGE GLASS,

7/21/2015: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF CROSSDEFENDANTS SURFACE PRODUCTS, INC. AND DANNY YEHIA FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS CONCERNING THE THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF WOODBRIDGE GLASS,

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

11/18/2015: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/23/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

197 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2016
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; (OSC RE Dismissal; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by WOODBRIDGE GLASS, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Receipt; Filed by City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; (Order to Show Cause; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
386 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2013
  • Stipulation and Order (RE: TRANSFER OF VENUE (SIGNED BY JUDGE LISA HART COLE) ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by ARB,INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Com; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by SANTA MONICA, CITY OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Complaint; Filed by City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); SANTA MONICA, CITY OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Complaint; Filed by City of Santa Monica (Plaintiff); SANTA MONICA, CITY OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

ROSS, WERSCHING & WOLCOTT, LLP William C. O’Neill/Bar No. 251071

FILED

Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles

2 |1 3151 Airway Ave., Bldg. S Costa Mesa, CA 92612 Telephone: (714) 444-3900 4 || Facsimile: (714) 444-3901

SEP 2.1 2015

Sherri R. Carter, Executive Officer/Clerk . By___Q.L_é__, Deputy | di L 5 || Attorneys for Cross-Defendants | Judi Lara SURFACE PRODUCTS, INC. and

6 | DANNY YEHIA 8 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES BY FAX

11 || CITY OF SANTA MONICA,

CASE NO. SC119923

ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO: Honorable Michelle R. Rosenblatt Department 40

Plaintiff,

1 3 VS-

14 || ARB, INC. and DOES 1 through 50, inclusive,

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS SURFACE

PRODUCTS, INC. AND DANNY YEHIA

FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS CONCERNING THE FOURTH AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF

WOODBRIDGE GLASS, INC.

Defendants.

17 || WOODBRIDGE GLASS, INC., Cross-Complainant. 18 VS.

19 || SURFACE PRODUCTS, INC.:

GROSVENOR NORTH AMERICA

N’ N’ N N S N N’ N’ N’Natl N Nt N Nt

29 || TECHNOLOGIES, INC.; DANIEL YEHIA 21 || @k/a DANNY YEHIA; INTERNATIONAL Date: December 18, 2015 PARKING DESIGN, INC.; MOORE Time: 8:30 a.m. 22 || RUBLE TUDELL ARCHITECTS & Department: 40 PLANNERS; ARB, INC.; ARB ‘ o 23 || STRUCTURES, INC.; and LOES 1 through s ” 4 50, inclusive, Complaint Filed: January 31, 2013 ) Cross-Defendants. SACC Filed: October 7, 2014

W REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS