This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2020 at 20:32:01 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS TEU PRODUCT COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/27/2010 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against TEU PRODUCT COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8625

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES CITY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

ENMEX CORP.

TEU PRODUCT COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRUTANICH CARMEN A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

4/29/2011: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

4/29/2011: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

COURT JUDGMENT

4/29/2011: COURT JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FEES DUE AND PAYABLE UNDER GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5

4/29/2011: NOTICE OF FEES DUE AND PAYABLE UNDER GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

4/29/2011: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 585 (B) AND CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800; DECLARATION OF ALICIA VEGA IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/29/2011: PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 585 (B) AND CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800; DECLARATION OF ALICIA VEGA IN SUPPORT THEREOF

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND OTHER RELIEF: 1) BREACH OF COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALINGS; 2) FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT TO ENTER INTO CONTRACTS; 3) FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE PROVISION

5/17/2011: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND OTHER RELIEF: 1) BREACH OF COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALINGS; 2) FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT TO ENTER INTO CONTRACTS; 3) FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE PROVISION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2011
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND OTHER RELIEF: 1) BREACH OF COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALINGS; 2) FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT TO ENTER INTO CONTRACTS; 3) FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE PROVISIONS REGULATING CONSUMER LOANS SECURED BY REAL PROPER*; 4)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 12; Unknown Event Type - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF FEES DUE AND PAYABLE UNDER GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 585 (B) AND CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800; DECLARATION OF ALICIA VEGA IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DocketCOURT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2011
  • DocketNotice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONEERENCE AND ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Los Angeles, City (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINVSS TAX ASSESSMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less