This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2015 at 23:39:35 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS RICHARD HIGGINS

Case Summary

On 08/07/2009 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against RICHARD HIGGINS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2040

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Defendants

HIGGINS RICHARD

HOLMES-HIGGINS TROYE E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELGADILLO ROCKARD J. CITY ATTORNEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

10/19/2009

DocketStatement-Agreement (Full) (FIRST SANA FILED BY MEDIATOR. MEDIATION TOOK PLACE ON 10/19/09 & LASTED A TOTAL OF 2 HOURS. THE MEDIATION IN FULL AGREEMENT. ) Filed by Mediator

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2009

DocketProof-Personal Service Filed by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2009

DocketProof-Personal Service Filed by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2009

DocketMiscellaneous-Other (PROOF OF SALE OR TURNING IN OF FIREARMS ) Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2009

DocketResponse to Harrassment Petition Filed by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2009

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2009

DocketProof-Personal Service Filed by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2009

DocketOrder to Show Cause Filed by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less