Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:20:09 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS PRICEWATERHOUSE COOPERS LLP

Case Summary

On 03/06/2015 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRICEWATERHOUSE COOPERS LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EMILIE H. ELIAS and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4690

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EMILIE H. ELIAS

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

PRICEWATERHOUSE COOPERS LLP

KHAN NASIR

BUTLER PAUL

CURTIN JAMES M.

TULLOCH RAYMOND M.

GARCIA DAVID

LAROCQUE TREVOR

DANIELE PHILLIP P.

Not Classified By Court

AVENTADOR UTILITY SOLUTIONS LLC

PARADIS PAUL O.

TUFARO GINA

PARADIS LAW GROUP PLLC

LANDSKRONER JACK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KIESEL LAW LLP

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

GEORGE ERIC MARC

ANNAGUEY MARIBETH

KIESEL PAUL ROBERT

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GIBSON DUNN & CRITCHER LLP

GIBSON DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

JAEGER CHARLES R. LAW OFFICES

ELLIOT LAUEN J.

CARTER MARGARET LOUISE

SUH MAURICE MIN-HO

THOMASCH DANIEL J.

SANTIAGO JAMES ALEXANDER

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

GELBERG GRANT BENJAMIN

SCHEPER DAVID CHARLES

Other Attorneys

FRIEDMAN IAN N.

 

Court Documents

Reply

7/18/2019: Reply

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/30/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Reply

1/12/2018: Reply

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/16/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Lodging

2/26/2018: Notice of Lodging

Separate Statement

3/29/2018: Separate Statement

Notice of Motion

5/25/2018: Notice of Motion

Declaration

8/31/2018: Declaration

Motion for Summary Judgment

9/28/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment

Minute Order

10/15/2018: Minute Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

12/12/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Opposition

6/21/2019: Opposition

Declaration

6/21/2019: Declaration

Order

8/18/2016: Order

Notice

8/24/2016: Notice

Exhibit List

2/3/2017: Exhibit List

Separate Statement

2/3/2017: Separate Statement

Response

3/24/2017: Response

597 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Hearingat 11:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing - Other (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Hearingat 11:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Hearingat 11:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing - Other (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Requests for Production and Production of Documents) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Re...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by JAMES M. CURTIN (Defendant); Pricewaterhouse Coopers, LLP (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,197 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Pricewaterhouse Coopers, LLP (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 324; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-03-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT BY MISREPRESENTATION; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRICEWATERHOUSE COOPERS, LLP is a litigant