This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 02:12:15 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS MARK L LEVINSON

Case Summary

On 05/31/2016 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against MARK L LEVINSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2071

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

LEVINSON MARK L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

Defendant Attorney

LEVINSON MARK L.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENT

5/31/2016: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENT

SUMMONS

5/31/2016: SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

6/1/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/1/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/21/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

8/10/2016: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/12/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/20/2016: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

9/28/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/30/2016: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

11/1/2016: Unknown

Unknown

11/4/2016: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

11/15/2016: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED CMC RULINGS

11/16/2016: NOTICE OF TRIAL AND RELATED CMC RULINGS

Minute Order

1/31/2017: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/15/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

2/28/2017: Minute Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 69; Non-Jury Trial (Court Trial - Short Cause; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 69; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 26; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 69; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 69; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • at 2:45 PM in Department 69; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY