This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 15:04:38 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS BRUSKIN INTERNATIONAL LLC

Case Summary

On 06/13/2012 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against BRUSKIN INTERNATIONAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENJI MACHIDA and WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6438

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENJI MACHIDA

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Defendants and Respondents

BRUSKIN INTERNATIONAL LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CHUN REGINALD

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/18/2013: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal

5/28/2013: Request for Dismissal

SUMMONS -

6/13/2012: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENT(S)

6/13/2012: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENT(S)

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

7/17/2012: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

MINUTE ORDER

12/17/2012: MINUTE ORDER

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/31/2012: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Proof of Service -

3/6/2013: Proof of Service -

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

3/28/2013: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4/19/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF RE:CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

4/22/2013: NOTICE OF RE:CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

PLAINTIFF?S PROOF OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANT; NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE; NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

4/26/2013: PLAINTIFF?S PROOF OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANT; NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE; NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Minute Order -

5/1/2013: Minute Order -

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 69; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS PROOF OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANT; NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE; NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 44; Status Conference (Status Conference; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF RE:CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • DocketNOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 44; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bruskin International LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHUN REGINALD