This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2020 at 13:45:38 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS AME ENTERPRISES INC

Case Summary

On 06/29/2009 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against AME ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6888

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Defendant

AME ENTERPRISE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELGADILLO ROCKARD J. CITY ATTORNEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/18/2014

DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2010

Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 12; (OSC RE Dismissal; Vacated) -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2010

Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 12; Court Order - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2010

DocketNOTICE OF FEES DUE AND PAYABLE UNDER GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2010

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2010

DocketNotice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2010

DocketJUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2010

DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2010

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2010

DocketPLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT PURSUANT 1O C.C.P. 585 (B) AND CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800; DECLARATION OF CRAIG SYKES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
02/22/2010

Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 12; Unknown Event Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2010

DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2010

DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2009

DocketORDER PERMITTING SERVICE OF PROCESS TO THE SECRETARY OF STATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2009

DocketOrder; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2009

DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2009

DocketAPPLICATION TO REQUEST A COURT ORDER TO SERVE PROCESS ON A CORPORATION BY DELIVERY TO THE SECRETARY OF STATE; ETC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2009

DocketSUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2009

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MONEY DUE ON UNPAID BUSINESS TAX ASSESSMENTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2009

DocketComplaint; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less