This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 10:37:49 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS ABE'S GARAGE DOORS & GATES INC

Case Summary

On 01/17/2014 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against ABE'S GARAGE DOORS GATES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3684

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

Defendants and Respondents

ABE'S GARAGE DOORS & GATES INC

DOES 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL N. FEUER CITY ATTORNEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE PROOF OF SERVICE) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (W/O PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT, ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketProof of Service (ABE'S GARAGE DOORS AND GATES ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABE`S GARAGE DOORS & GATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL N. FEUER CITY ATTORNEY