This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2016 at 08:14:26 (UTC).

CITY OF AZUSA VS ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN THE MATTER

Case Summary

On 11/05/2015 CITY OF AZUSA filed an Other lawsuit against ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN THE MATTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DUKES, ROBERT A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8009

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DUKES, ROBERT A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AZUSA CITY OF

Defendant

ALL PERSONS INTERESTED IN THE MATTER OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEED MICHAEL C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2016
  • Application - Miscellaneous (FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN VALIDATION PROCEEDING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • Order (GRANTING EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN VALIDATION PROCEEDING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Ex-Parte Application (FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN VALIDATION PROCEEDING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Memorandum - Other (OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN VALIDATION PROCEEDING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Declaration (OF JESSICA KENNY IN SUPPORT OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN VALIDATION PROCEEDING ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Default Entered (*DEFAULT JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO R.A.* ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Proof of Publication Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Declaration (DECL OF MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Proof of Service (PROOF OF POSTING OF SUMMONS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Ex-Parte Application and Order (FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZUSA CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL PERSONS INTERESTED is a litigant