This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2020 at 18:23:03 (UTC).

CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS REALTY CORP VS MOODY NATIONAL RI TO

Case Summary

On 05/21/2010 CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS REALTY CORP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MOODY NATIONAL RI TO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUTH ANN KWAN, ANN I. JONES, KEVIN C. BRAZILE, BARBARA A. MEIERS and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8310

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUTH ANN KWAN

ANN I. JONES

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

BARBARA A. MEIERS

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS REALTY CORP.

Defendants and Respondents

BAYER CAROLE

BAYER ROBERT V.

CALDERONI FELICE J.

CALDERONI SUSAN D.

COLLS LUIS R.

COSS CAROL

COSTANTINO THOMAS A.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

DUNN RONALD S.

FATUROS JOHN V.

FATUROS MARIA

JACOBSON EDMUND

JOHNSON ANNIE DU BUC

KERWOOD RONALD L.

KIM GRACE K.

KIM YOUNG H.

KRASSILNIKOFF LAURIE

KRASSILNIKOFF SERGEY

KWAN CHEUK S.

160 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SCOULAR ROBERT F. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ERVIN COHEN & JESSUP LLP

LEFF RANDALL S. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2016
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal ( *With Prejudice ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 86, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2011
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE 3/2 MOTION TO 4/4/11 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • Docketat 09:30 am in Department 86, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Motion (TO APPOINT A RECEIVER) - Proceeding continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2011
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to continue 1/28/11 motion to appoint receiver to 3/2/11 ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to continue motion from 12/16 to 1/28/11 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2010
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • Docketat 09:30 am in Department 86, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Motion (TO APPOINT A RECEIVER) - Proceeding continued

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • DocketNotice of Hearing (on order to show cause re service of summons and complaint ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • DocketPoints and Authorities (IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • DocketMotion for an Order (FOR ORDER APPOINTING A RECEIVER; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • DocketNotice (OF PENDENCY OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • DocketDeclaration (OF PHILIP G. HOLMES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPOINTING A RECEIVER; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citigroup Global Markets Reality Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEFF RANDALL S